Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0373762

EP0373762 - Surgical stapler cartridge lockout device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.11.1997
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.01.1998 [1998/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ETHICON, INC.
U.S. Route 22
Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US
[N/P]
Former [1990/25]For all designated states
ETHICON INC.
U.S. Route 22
Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Fox, William D.
2606 Jett Hill Road
New Richmond, OH / US
02 / Nobis, Rudolph H.
4129 O'Leary Avenue
Cincinnati, OH 45236 / US
03 / Nuchols, Richard P.
1459 Betty Drive
Beavercreek, OH 45385 / US
[1990/25]
Representative(s)Fisher, Adrian John , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/25]Fisher, Adrian John , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date89311463.706.11.1989
[1990/25]
Priority number, dateUS1988026790707.11.1988         Original published format: US 267907
[1990/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0373762
Date:20.06.1990
Language:EN
[1990/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0373762
Date:15.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.1990
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/10
[1990/25]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU,   NL,   SE [1990/25]
TitleGerman:Patronenaussperrvorrichtung eines chirurgischen Klammersetzgerätes[1990/25]
English:Surgical stapler cartridge lockout device[1990/25]
French:Dispositif de blocage pour cartouche d'agrafeuse chirurgicale[1990/25]
Examination procedure27.11.1990Examination requested  [1991/04]
10.02.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.07.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.02.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.01.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.06.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.10.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.04.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.1996Fee for grant paid
11.06.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.10.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.11.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
08.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
15.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
09.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
11.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2744824  (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP);
 [A]US4506819  (RAND BURT E [US]);
 [A]EP0068046  (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US])