Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0376557

EP0376557 - Steering system for the rear wheels of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.01.1996
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For:GB 
Ford Motor Company Limited
Eagle Way Brentwood
Essex / GB
For:FR 
FORD FRANCE S.A.
B.P. 307
92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR
For:DE 
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Henry-Ford-Strasse 1
50725 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/27]For:GB 
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED
Eagle Way
Brentwood Essex / GB
For:FR 
FORD FRANCE S. A.
B.P. 307
F-92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR
For:DE 
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-50725 Köln / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Oslapas, Algis
6904 Lafayette
Dearborn Heights Michigan 48127 / US
02 / Rumpel, Manfred
4494, Chamberlain Drive
Birmingham Michigan 48010 / US
[1990/27]
Representative(s)Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
Harrison IP Limited
3 Ebor House
London Ebor Business Park
Millfield Lane
Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/27]Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway
Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB
Application number, filing date89313110.214.12.1989
[1990/27]
Priority number, dateUS1988029020927.12.1988         Original published format: US 290209
[1990/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0376557
Date:04.07.1990
Language:EN
[1990/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0376557
Date:19.12.1990
Language:EN
[1990/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0376557
Date:01.02.1995
Language:EN
[1995/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.1990
ClassificationInternational:B62D7/14
[1990/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1990/27]
TitleGerman:Lenksystem für die Hinterräder eines Fahrzeuges[1990/27]
English:Steering system for the rear wheels of a vehicle[1990/27]
French:Système de direction pour les roues arrières d'un véhicule[1990/27]
Examination procedure25.05.1991Examination requested  [1991/30]
29.03.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.06.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.1994Fee for grant paid
14.06.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1996/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
03.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
21.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR01.02.1995
DE03.05.1995
[2006/14]
Former [1995/41]DE03.05.1995
FR30.06.1995
Former [1995/40]DE03.05.1995
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP62187656  ;
 [X]DE3338700  (TOYO KOGYO CO [JP]);
 [YD]US4566711  (KOIZUMI YUSUKE [JP], et al);
 [X]DE3728678  (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]);
 [A]GB2194927  (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP);
 [AP]DE3831932  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP])
 [Y]  PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 36 (M-664)(2883) 03 February 1988, & JP-A-62 187656 (HONDA MOTOR CO. LTD) 17 August 1987,,