blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0324662

EP0324662 - Crossbar system for controlled data transfer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.12.1991
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.1991Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.02.1992 [1992/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EVANS & SUTHERLAND COMPUTER CORPORATION
580 Arapeen Drive Salt Lake City
Utah 84108 / US
[N/P]
Former [1989/29]For all designated states
EVANS & SUTHERLAND COMPUTER CORPORATION
580 Arapeen Drive
Salt Lake City Utah 84108 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dulong, Carole
1420 Highland View Court
Los Altos California 94022 / US
02 / Scaglia, Patrick
18983 Harleigh Drive
Saratoga California 95070 / US
03 / Leclerc, Jean-Yves
1420 Highland View Court
Los Altos California 94022 / US
[1989/29]
Representative(s)Bourgognon, Jean-Marie
Cabinet Flechner 22, Avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1989/29]Bourgognon, Jean-Marie
Cabinet Flechner 22, Avenue de Friedland
F-75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date89400006.603.01.1989
[1989/29]
Priority number, dateUS1988014420115.01.1988         Original published format: US 144201
[1989/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0324662
Date:19.07.1989
Language:EN
[1989/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0324662
Date:17.01.1990
Language:EN
[1990/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.1989
ClassificationIPC:G06F15/16, H04L11/20
[1990/01]
CPC:
G06F15/17375 (EP)
Former IPC [1989/29]G06F15/16
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1989/29]
TitleGerman:Kreuzschienensystem für gesteuerte Datenübertragung[1989/29]
English:Crossbar system for controlled data transfer[1989/29]
French:Système à commutateur à coordonnées pour le transfert de données réglé[1989/29]
File destroyed:02.03.1998
Examination procedure03.07.1990Examination requested  [1990/36]
01.08.1991Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1992/06]
29.08.1991Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1992/06]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.199103   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2519442  ;
 [Y]EP0097351  ;
 [Y]FR2231050
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.