Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0325506

EP0325506 - Security system for protecting the programming zones of an IC card [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  02.03.1994
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.A.
7, Avenue Galliéni
94250 Gentilly / FR
[N/P]
Former [1989/30]For all designated states
SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.A.
7, Avenue Galliéni
F-94250 Gentilly / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Bahout, Yvon
CABINET BALLOT-SCHMIT 84, Avenue Kléber
F-75116 Paris / FR
02 / Lisimaque, Gilles
CABINET BALLOT-SCHMIT 84, Avenue Kléber
F-75116 Paris / FR
[1989/30]
Representative(s)Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques
Cabinet Ballot
122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1992/14]Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques
Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 7, rue Le Sueur
F-75116 Paris / FR
Former [1989/30]Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques
Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7, rue le Sueur
F-75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date89400083.511.01.1989
[1989/30]
Priority number, dateFR1988000059420.01.1988         Original published format: FR 8800594
[1989/30]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0325506
Date:26.07.1989
Language:FR
[1989/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.1989
ClassificationInternational:G07F7/10, G06F1/00
[1989/30]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [1989/30]
TitleGerman:Sicherheitssystem zum Schützen der Programmierzonen einer Chipkarte[1989/30]
English:Security system for protecting the programming zones of an IC card[1989/30]
French:Système de sécurité pour protéger des zones de programmation d'une carte à puce[1989/30]
Examination procedure18.09.1989Examination requested  [1989/47]
03.07.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.11.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.1992Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1994/16]
27.02.1994Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/16]
Appeal following examination22.04.1992Appeal received No.  T0578/92
06.06.1992Statement of grounds filed
02.02.1994Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
15.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4105156  ;
 [Y]EP0089876  ;
 [A]US4268911  ;
 [A]WO8705420  ;
 [A]US4613937  ;
 [A]EP0218176  ;
 [AP]GB2206431
 [A]  - L'ONDE ELECTRIQUE, vol. 64, no. 1, janvier-février 1984, pages 18-23, Paris, FR; C. GUION: "La carte à mémoire: choix technologiques et caractéristiques"