Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0325506 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0325506



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 99
21.02.1994 Closing of application Search / examination 1
17.02.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
02.02.1994 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 15
08.07.1992 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
07.07.1992 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
06.06.1992 Claims Appeal 2
06.06.1992 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
22.04.1992 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
03.03.1992 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
29.02.1992 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
25.02.1992 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 15
25.11.1991 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
18.11.1991 Annex Search / examination 4
18.11.1991 Claims Search / examination 2
18.11.1991 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.11.1991 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.11.1991 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.07.1991 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
21.07.1989 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.06.1989 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
29.05.1989 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.05.1989 European search report Search / examination 2
11.01.1989 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.01.1989 Claims Search / examination 2
11.01.1989 Description Search / examination 11
11.01.1989 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.1989 Drawings Search / examination 2
11.01.1989 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
11.01.1989 Priority document Search / examination 10
11.01.1989 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5