blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0325546

EP0325546 - Snowsurf [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  23.08.1996
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Remondet, Jean-Pierre
Chalet "Le Tournavel" Le Cret
F-73150 Val d'Isère / FR
[1989/30]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1989/30]
Representative(s)Maureau, Philippe, et al
Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU
12, rue Boileau
B.P. 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1989/30]Maureau, Philippe, et al
Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU BP 3011
F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR
Application number, filing date89420015.317.01.1989
[1989/30]
Priority number, dateFR1988000082018.01.1988         Original published format: FR 8800820
[1989/30]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0325546
Date:26.07.1989
Language:FR
[1989/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0325546
Date:23.10.1991
Language:FR
[1991/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.1989
ClassificationIPC:A63C5/03
[1989/30]
CPC:
A63C5/03 (EP,US); A63C5/0411 (EP,US); A63C5/0485 (EP,US);
A63C10/08 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   LI,   SE [1989/30]
TitleGerman:Schneesurf[1989/30]
English:Snowsurf[1989/30]
French:Surf à neige[1989/30]
Examination procedure14.07.1989Examination requested  [1989/37]
05.06.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.04.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.07.1991Fee for grant paid
17.07.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.07.1992  05.08.1992  ADMISSIBLE
SA Sportair
Lieudit vers la Gare
F- 74370 PRINGY / FR
Opponent's representative
Loyer, Bertrand
Cabinet Loyer & Abello 9, rue de la Forge
75017 Paris / FR
 [N/P]
Former [1992/38]
Opponent(s)01  20.07.1992  05.08.1992  ADMISSIBLE
SA Sportair
Lieudit vers la Gare
F- 74370 PRINGY / FR
Opponent's representative
Loyer, Bertrand
Cabinet Pierre Loyer 77, rue Boissière
F-75116 Paris / FR
24.08.1992Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.12.1992Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.01.1993Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
22.03.1993Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
09.08.1993Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.1993Reply to a communication from the opposition division
14.12.1994Date of oral proceedings
16.01.1995Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.01.1995Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
26.01.1995Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1996/41]
Appeal following opposition09.02.1995Appeal received No.  T0146/95
13.04.1995Statement of grounds filed
23.07.1996Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
23.07.1996Date of oral proceedings
30.07.1996Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES23.10.1991
BE31.01.1992
AT17.01.1993
SE18.01.1993
CH31.01.1993
LI31.01.1993
DE01.10.1993
[2002/24]
Former [1996/19]BE31.01.1992
AT17.01.1993
SE18.01.1993
CH31.01.1993
LI31.01.1993
DE01.10.1993
Former [1994/25]BE31.01.1992
AT17.01.1993
SE18.01.1993
CH31.01.1993
LI31.01.1993
FR30.09.1993
DE01.10.1993
Former [1994/22]BE31.01.1992
SE18.01.1993
CH31.01.1993
LI31.01.1993
DE01.10.1993
Former [1994/04]BE31.01.1992
SE18.01.1993
CH31.01.1993
LI31.01.1993
Former [1993/46]BE31.01.1992
SE18.01.1993
Former [1993/01]BE31.01.1992
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2557275  (STUMM FRIEDRICH VON);
 [A]DE2924023  (SEYSSEL D AIX LUDWIG GRAF VON);
 [A]CH647415  (JEAN DENIS SCHEIBENSTOCK, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.