blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0359679

EP0359679 - Method of producing a diode for control and protection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.1994
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.1995Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 08.03.1995 [1995/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.A.
7, Avenue Galliéni
94250 Gentilly / FR
[N/P]
Former [1990/12]For all designated states
SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.A.
7, Avenue Galliéni
F-94250 Gentilly / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Ducreux, Gérard
5, avenue de la Liberté
37230 Luynes / FR
[1990/12]
Representative(s)de Beaumont, Michel
1bis, rue Champollion
38000 Grenoble / FR
[N/P]
Former [1990/12]de Beaumont, Michel
1bis, rue Champollion
F-38000 Grenoble / FR
Application number, filing date89420327.206.09.1989
[1990/12]
Priority number, dateFR1988001234609.09.1988         Original published format: FR 8812346
[1990/12]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0359679
Date:21.03.1990
Language:FR
[1990/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0359679
Date:16.02.1994
Language:FR
[1994/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.1990
ClassificationIPC:H01L21/329, H01L29/90
[1990/12]
CPC:
H10D8/022 (EP,KR,US); H10D89/60 (EP,KR,US); H10D8/25 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S148/174 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1990/12]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Regelungs- und Schutzdiode[1990/12]
English:Method of producing a diode for control and protection[1990/12]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'une diode de régulation et de protection[1990/12]
Examination procedure05.09.1990Examination requested  [1990/45]
03.05.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.08.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.09.1993Fee for grant paid
16.09.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.11.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.09.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
15.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
16.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL16.02.1994
[1995/10]
Documents cited:Search[A]US4177095  (NELSON CARL T [US]);
 [A]DE3151437  (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE [DE]);
 [A]GB2130792  (BURR BROWN RES CORP)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.