blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0330630

EP0330630 - Electrical heating resistance for hot air generators [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.06.1995
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.1999Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR, LU
published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bulgarini, Claudio
Via Bongiorni 18
I-25100 Brescia / IT
[1989/35]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1989/35]
Representative(s)Manzoni, Alessandro
MANZONI & MANZONI, UFFICIO INTERNAZIONALE BREVETTI, P.le Arnaldo 2
25121 Brescia / IT
[N/P]
Former [1989/35]Manzoni, Alessandro
MANZONI & MANZONI, UFFICIO INTERNAZIONALE BREVETTI, P.le Arnaldo 2
I-25121 Brescia / IT
Application number, filing date89830069.421.02.1989
[1989/35]
Priority number, dateIT19880006938U24.02.1988         Original published format: IT 693888 U
[1989/35]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0330630
Date:30.08.1989
Language:FR
[1989/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0330630
Date:10.08.1994
Language:FR
[1994/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.06.1989
ClassificationIPC:H05B3/16
[1989/35]
CPC:
H05B3/16 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/35]
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Heizwiderstand für Warmluftgeneratoren[1989/35]
English:Electrical heating resistance for hot air generators[1989/35]
French:Résistance électrique de chauffage pour générateurs d'air chaud[1989/35]
Examination procedure13.02.1990Examination requested  [1990/17]
04.02.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.02.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.04.1994Fee for grant paid
09.04.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.05.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
20.02.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
20.04.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.199406   M06   Fee paid on   20.04.1994
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR10.08.1994
NL10.08.1994
SE10.11.1994
BE28.02.1995
CH28.02.1995
LI28.02.1995
LU28.02.1995
[2000/04]
Former [1996/05]NL10.08.1994
SE10.11.1994
BE28.02.1995
CH28.02.1995
LI28.02.1995
Former [1996/02]NL10.08.1994
SE10.11.1994
CH28.02.1995
LI28.02.1995
Former [1995/29]NL10.08.1994
SE10.11.1994
Former [1995/15]NL10.08.1994
Documents cited:Search[X]FR1282480  ;
 [A]FR2582179  ;
 [A]FR2497049  ;
 [A]DE1805639  ;
 [A]DE2531854  ;
 [A]DE3141828  ;
 [A]DE2830533  ;
 [A]DE2530369
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.