Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0364413

EP0364413 - Hermetic metal pipe joint [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  27.02.1998
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GR
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DALMINE S.p.A.
Via Brera, 19
I-20125 Milano / IT
[1990/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Cappelli, Cataldo
Via Trieste, 28
I-24044 Dalmine (Bergamo) / IT
02 / Morlotti, Norberto
Via degli Albani, 17
I-24100 Bergamo / IT
[1990/16]
Representative(s)Mariani, Giulio
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1992/44]Mariani, Giulio
c/o Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.r.l., Viale Bianca Maria 33
I-20122 Milano / IT
Former [1990/16]Mariani, Giulio
c/o Centro Sviluppo Materiali SpA P.O. BOX 10747
I-00100 Roma Eur / IT
Application number, filing date89830425.829.09.1989
[1990/16]
Priority number, dateIT1988004841103.10.1988         Original published format: IT 4841188
[1990/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0364413
Date:18.04.1990
Language:EN
[1990/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0364413
Date:05.07.1995
Language:EN
[1995/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.1990
ClassificationInternational:F16L15/06, E21B17/042
[1990/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1990/16]
TitleGerman:Hermetische Metallrohrverbindung[1990/16]
English:Hermetic metal pipe joint[1990/16]
French:Joint hermétique pour tuyau métallique[1990/16]
Examination procedure29.05.1990Examination requested  [1990/33]
20.02.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.12.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.12.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.1993Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
09.12.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.12.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.1995Fee for grant paid
21.03.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.04.1996  16.04.1996  ADMISSIBLE
VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE
54, rue Anatole France
59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR
Opponent's representative
Desolneux, Jean-Paul Charles
Setval Division Propriété Industrielle 130, rue de Silly
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
 [1998/02]
Former [1996/21]
Opponent(s)01  02.04.1996  16.04.1996  ADMISSIBLE
VALLOUREC OIL & GAS
54, rue Anatole France
59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR
Opponent's representative
Desolneux, Jean-Paul Charles
Setval Division Propriété Industrielle 130, rue de Silly
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
07.05.1996Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.09.1996Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.10.1997Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1998/16]
08.10.1997Date of oral proceedings
19.11.1997Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.11.1997Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition26.05.1993Appeal received No.  T0788/93
08.07.1993Statement of grounds filed
19.12.1994Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
18.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
01.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
22.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.199305   M06   Fee paid on   07.01.1994
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU30.09.1995
[2015/21]
Former [2003/19]LU30.09.1995
GR03.10.1995
Former [2000/06]LU30.09.1995
Documents cited:Search[A]WO8402948  ;
 [A]US4736967  ;
 [A]FR1564218  ;
 [AD]US4153283  ;
 [A]EP0150657  ;
 [AD]EP0273016  ;
 [A]FR2324973