Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0328504

EP0328504 - Method of manufacturing a plastic cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1989/33]Plastic cartridge and syringe
[1995/19]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.03.1996
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.05.1996 [1996/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Astra Aktiebolag
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[N/P]
Former [1994/36]For all designated states
Astra Aktiebolag
S-151 85 Södertälje / SE
Former [1989/33]For all designated states
AKTIEBOLAGET ASTRA
S-151 85 Södertälje / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Kimber, Michael Browning
5 Mariana Close
St. Ives Sydney NSW 2075 / AU
[1989/33]
Representative(s)Linderoth, Margareta , et al
AstraZenaca AB Global Intellectual Property
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[N/P]
Former [1989/33]Linderoth, Margareta , et al
AB Astra Patent Department
S-151 85 Södertälje / SE
Application number, filing date89850046.709.02.1989
[1989/33]
Priority number, dateAU1988001160310.02.1988         Original published format: AU 1160388
[1989/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0328504
Date:16.08.1989
Language:EN
[1989/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0328504
Date:10.05.1995
Language:EN
[1995/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.06.1989
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/28, A61M5/32
[1989/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1995/19]
Former [1989/33]ES,  GR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum herstellung einer Kunststoffampulle[1995/19]
English:Method of manufacturing a plastic cartridge[1995/19]
French:Methode de fabrication d'une cartouche en plastique[1995/19]
Former [1989/33]Kunststoffampulle und Spritze
Former [1989/33]Plastic cartridge and syringe
Former [1989/33]Cartouche en plastique et seringue
MiscellaneousEPB 1991/31: Verbunden mit 89902557.1/0400050 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 18.06.91
EPB 1991/31: Consolidated with 89902557.1/0400050 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 18.06.91
EPB 1991/31: Jointe à la demande no. 89902557.1/0400050 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 18.06.91
Examination procedure01.03.1989Examination requested  [1989/33]
16.07.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.06.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.1993Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
06.03.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
25.06.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
14.10.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
08.11.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.1995Fee for grant paid
28.01.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.02.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18]
Request for further processing for:06.03.1993Request for further processing filed
06.03.1993Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.03.1993Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
08.02.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
08.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
10.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:SearchUS3375825  [ ] (KELLER GEORGE H);
 WO8603126  [ ] (PICKHARD EWALD);
 US3756235  [ ] (BURKE G, et al);
 GB1386030  [ ] (PHILIPS NV);
 FR2375871  [ ] (ZEJMA FERDINAND [FR]);
 US3073307  [ ] (STEVENS PETER A)