Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0351392

EP0351392 - Process and catalyst for producing syndiotactic polyolefins [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  14.01.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.01.2005Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 02.03.2005  [2005/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FINA TECHNOLOGY, INC.
P.O. Box 674412 Houston
Texas 77267-4412 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
FINA TECHNOLOGY, INC.
P.O. Box 674412
Houston, Texas 77267-4412 / US
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
FINA TECHNOLOGY, INC.
P.O. Box 674412
Houston, Texas 77167-4412 / US
Former [1999/19]For all designated states
FINA TECHNOLOGY, INC.
6000 Legacy Drive
Plano, Texas 75024 / US
Former [1990/03]For all designated states
FINA TECHNOLOGY, INC.
8350 North Central Expressway
Dallas, Texas 75206 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ewen, John A.
Kentwood Avenue 16615
Houston Texas 77058 / US
02 / Razavi, Abbas
2601 N. Repsdorph No. 713
Seabrook Texas / US
[1990/03]
Representative(s)Detrait, Jean-Claude , et al
Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE
[N/P]
Former [1990/03]Detrait, Jean-Claude , et al
c/o Fina Research S.A. Patent Department Zone Industrielle C
B-7181 Feluy / BE
Application number, filing date89870079.431.05.1989
[1990/03]
Priority number, dateUS1988022000715.07.1988         Original published format: US 220007
[1990/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0351392
Date:17.01.1990
Language:EN
[1990/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0351392
Date:18.11.1993
Language:EN
[1993/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0351392
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0351392
Date:02.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.09.1993
ClassificationInternational:C08F4/642, C08F10/00, C07F17/00
[2001/14]
Former International [1994/17]C07H15/12, C07H17/00, C07C45/00
Former International [1993/41]C08F4/642, C08F10/00, C07F17/00
Former International [1990/22]C08F4/642, C08F10/00
Former International [1990/03]C08F4/74, C08F4/622, C08F110/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1990/03]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Katalysator zur Herstellung syndiotaktischer Polyolefine[1990/03]
English:Process and catalyst for producing syndiotactic polyolefins[1990/03]
French:Procédé et catalyseur pour produire des polyoléfines syndiotactiques[1990/03]
Examination procedure05.06.1989Examination requested  [1990/03]
30.01.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.05.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.04.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
07.03.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
19.04.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.2000Fee for grant paid
25.07.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.01.2002  25.02.2002  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Strasse 4
80335 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2005/02]
Opponent(s)01  31.01.2002  25.02.2002  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR
Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Former [2002/13]
Opponent(s)01  31.01.2002  25.02.2002  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
D-81679 München / DE
07.03.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.09.2002Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.06.2004Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.06.2004Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.10.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
22.12.2004Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
16.07.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
12.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
17.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
26.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 08
03.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 09
29.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 10
27.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 11
26.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.06.199204   M06   Fee paid on   16.07.1992
01.06.199406   M06   Fee paid on   17.06.1994
31.05.199507   M06   Fee paid on   13.07.1995
31.05.199709   M06   Fee paid on   03.07.1997
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR02.05.2001
[2004/07]
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0316155  (CHISSO CORP [JP], et al) [PX] 1-10 * page 5, line 57 - line 58 * * page 6, line 1 - line 11 * * page 6, line 13 - line 17 * * page 6, line 36 - line 46 * * page 6, line 50 - line 54 *;
 [DA]US3364190  (EMRICK DONALD D) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - EWEN J A, "Mechanisms of stereochemical control in propylene polymerizations with soluble group 4B metallocene/methylalumoxane catalysts", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1984), vol. 106, pages 6355 - 6364, XP002058841 [A] 1-10 * page 6362, Table XII, line 3 * * page 6362, column L, paragraph L - page 6363, column R, paragraph 6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00333a041
 [PX]  - EWEN J A ET AL, "Syndiospecific propylene polymerizations with group 4 metallocenes", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1988), vol. 110, no. 18, pages 6255 - 6256, XP002051494 [PX] 1-35 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00226a056
 [A]  - KATZ T J ET AL, "'1,1'-Methylenetitanocene dichloride", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1970), vol. 28, pages 2497 - 2499, XP000979888 [A] 33-35 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(01)98265-6
 [A]  - SCHWEMLEIN H ET AL, "Ansa-metallocene derivatives. V. Synthesis of tetramethylethylene-bridges titanocene and zirconocene derivatives via reductive fulvene coupling", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, (1983), vol. 254, pages 69 - 73, XP000979889 [A] 33-35 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-328X(83)85118-3
OppositionEP0185918
 EP0129368
 EP0128046
 EP0277004
 EP0423101