Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0394326

EP0394326 - METHODS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CONFORMATIONALLY STABILIZED CELL ADHESION PEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1990/44]CONFORMATIONALLY STABILIZED CELL ADHESION PEPTIDES
[1996/31]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  08.04.2011
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2011Revocation of patentpublished on 11.05.2011  [2011/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LA JOLLA CANCER RESEARCH FOUNDATION
10901 North Torrey Pines Road
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
[1995/32]
Former [1992/27]For all designated states
LA JOLLA CANCER RESEARCH FOUNDATION
2945 Science Park Road
La Jolla California 92037 / US
Former [1990/44]For all designated states
LA JOLLA CANCER RESEARCH FOUNDATION
10901 North Torrey Pines Road
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PIERSCHBACHER, Michael, D.
1111 Alexandria Drive
San Diego, CA 92107 / US
02 / RUOSLAHTI, Erkki, I.
P.O. Box 1054
Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 / US
[1990/44]
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/44]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
D-22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date89900774.408.12.1988
[1990/44]
WO1988US04403
Priority number, dateUS1987013139010.12.1987         Original published format: US 131390
[1990/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO8905150
Date:15.06.1989
Language:EN
[1989/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0394326
Date:31.10.1990
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.1989
[1990/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0394326
Date:31.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.06.1989
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.1991
ClassificationInternational:C07K1/00, C07K4/12, C07K14/435, A61K38/00, C07K7/06, C07K7/08
[1996/31]
Former International [1990/44]A61K37/02, C07K5/12, C07K7/06, C07K7/08, C07K7/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1990/44]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CONFORMATIONNELL STABILISIERTEN ZELLADHÄSIONSPEPTIDEN[1996/31]
English:METHODS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CONFORMATIONALLY STABILIZED CELL ADHESION PEPTIDES[1996/31]
French:METHODES POUR LA PRODUCTION DES PEPTIDES D'ADHESION CELLULAIRE A STABILISATION CONFORMATIONNELLE[1996/31]
Former [1990/44]KONFORMATIONNELL STABILISIERTE ZELLADHÄSIONSPEPTIDE
Former [1990/44]CONFORMATIONALLY STABILIZED CELL ADHESION PEPTIDES
Former [1990/44]PEPTIDES D'ADHESION CELLULAIRE A STABILISATION CONFORMATIONNELLE
MiscellaneousEPB 1996/31: Teilanmeldung 95250301.9 eingereicht am 07/12/95
EPB 1996/31: Divisional application 95250301.9 filed on 07/12/95
EPB 1996/31: Demande divisionnaire 95250301.9 déposée le 07/12/95
Entry into regional phase25.05.1990National basic fee paid 
25.05.1990Search fee paid 
25.05.1990Designation fee(s) paid 
25.05.1990Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.1989Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
25.05.1990Examination requested  [1990/44]
14.10.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.04.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
16.01.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
29.01.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.1996Fee for grant paid
20.03.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP95250301.9  / EP0731110
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.04.1997  15.07.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Merck Patent GmbH
Postfach
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius, Volker, et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2000/41]
Opponent(s)01  30.04.1997  15.07.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Merck Patent GmbH
Postfach Frankfurter Strasse 250
D-64293 Darmstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius, Volker, Dr., et al
Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei - Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Holbeinstrasse 5
81679 München / DE
Former [1997/26]
Opponent(s)01  30.04.1997  15.07.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Merck Patent GmbH
Postfach Frankfurter Strasse 250
D-64271 Darmstadt / DE
18.07.1997Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.12.1997Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.02.1999Date of oral proceedings
30.04.1999Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.2006Reply to a communication from the opposition division
26.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
03.04.2007Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.07.2007Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
23.11.2007Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
31.03.2008Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.04.2008Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.04.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
23.12.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
03.01.2011Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/19]
Appeal following opposition29.06.1999Appeal received No.  T0699/99
10.09.1999Statement of grounds filed
19.01.2005Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
19.01.2005Date of oral proceedings
28.01.2005Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
20.10.2004Date of oral proceedings
27.10.2004Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
23.01.2003Date of oral proceedings
18.02.2003Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
09.12.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
07.12.1994Renewal fee patent year 07
08.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.12.1998
SE09.12.1998
BE31.12.1998
NL01.07.1999
IT08.12.2005
GB07.12.2008
[2009/30]
Former [2007/34]AT08.12.1998
SE09.12.1998
BE31.12.1998
NL01.07.1999
IT08.12.2005
Former [2001/51]AT08.12.1998
SE09.12.1998
BE31.12.1998
NL01.07.1999
Former [2000/25]AT08.12.1998
BE31.12.1998
NL01.07.1999
Former [2000/24]AT08.12.1998
BE31.12.1998
Former [2000/23]BE31.12.1998
Cited inInternational search[X]US4589881  ;
 [X]US4605512  ;
 [X]US4517686  ;
 [XP]US4789734  ;
 [X]US4578079  ;
 [X]US4683291  ;
 [X]US4661111  ;
 [X]US4614517
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 104, issued 26 May 1986 (Columbus, OH.) (CHERESH) "Disialogangliosides GD2 and GD3 are Involved in the Attachment of Human Melanoma and Neuroblastoma Cells to Extracellular Matrix Proteins". Abstract No. 183980c
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 107, issued 06 July 1987 (Columbus, OH.) (YAMADA) "Peptide Inhibitors of Fibronectin, Laminin, and other Adhesion Molecules: Unique and Shared Features". Abstract No. 5066p
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 105, issued 10 November 1986 (Columbus, OH.) (POOLE) "Antibodies and a Synthetic Peptide that Block Cellfibronectin Adhesion Arrest Neural Crest Cell Migration in Vivo". Abstract No. 169400c
 [X]  - The Journal of Cell Biology, Vol. 105, (No. 6, Pt. 2) issued 1987 (TODA) "Fibronectin Receptors of Human Keratinocytes and their Expression During Cell Culture". pages 3097-3104 (see Abstract).
 [X]  - The Journal of Cell Biology, Vol. 104, issued 1987, (SINGER) "The Fibronectin Cell Attachment Sequence Arg-Gly-Asp-Ser Promotes Focal Contact Formation During Early Fibroblast Attachment and Spreading". pages 573-584 (see Abstract).
 [X]  - Developmental Biology, Vol. 123, issued 1987 (LASH) "Synthetic Peptides that Mimic the Adhesive Recognition Signal of Fibronectin: Differential Effects on Cell-Cell and Cell-Substratum Adhesion in Embryonic Chick Cells 1". pages 411-420 (see summary)
 [X]  - The Journal of Biological Chemistry, Vol. 262, No. 36, issued 25 December 1987, (PIERSCHBACHER) "Influence of Stereochemistry of the Sequence Arg-Gly-Asp-Xaa on Binding Specificity in Cell Adhesion". pages 17294-17298 (see summary).
 [X]  - Blood, issued 1985, Vol. 66, No. 4, (HAVERSTICK) "Inhibition of Platelet Adhesion to Fibronectin, Fibrinogen, and von Willebrand Factor Substrates by a Synthetic Tetrapeptide Derived from the Cell-Binding Domain of Fibronectin". pages 946-952 (see summary).