Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0394326 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0394326



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1097
13.04.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
06.04.2011 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
06.04.2011 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
01.04.2011 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
30.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
23.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
23.12.2010 Decision revoking the European Patent (patent proprietor) Opposition 3
23.12.2010 Decision revoking the European patent (opponent) Opposition 3
06.09.2010 Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit Opposition 2
19.04.2010 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
19.04.2010 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
19.04.2010 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
13.04.2010 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
08.04.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.04.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.04.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.03.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.03.2008 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
31.03.2008 Text intended for grant Opposition 17
17.03.2008 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
27.11.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.11.2007 Claims Opposition 4
23.11.2007 Description Opposition 3
23.11.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
21.09.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.09.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.07.2007 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
11.07.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
22.05.2007 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
20.04.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.04.2007 Description Opposition 8
03.04.2007 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
26.01.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
26.01.2007 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
26.01.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.12.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
18.12.2006 Notice of opposition Opposition 2
18.10.2006 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
23.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.08.2006 Description Opposition 2
16.08.2006 Description Opposition 3
16.08.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.08.2006 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 7
05.04.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
05.04.2006 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
05.04.2006 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
05.04.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
13.03.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.10.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 36
28.01.2005 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 10
18.01.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.01.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.01.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.01.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.12.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
23.12.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.12.2004 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
22.12.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.12.2004 Claims Appeal 4
20.12.2004 Claims Appeal 3
20.12.2004 Claims Appeal 3
20.12.2004 Claims Appeal 2
20.12.2004 Claims Appeal 4
20.12.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
20.12.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 7
20.12.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 11
17.12.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
14.12.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.11.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.11.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.11.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.11.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.10.2004 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
29.10.2004 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
27.10.2004 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
26.10.2004 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
15.10.2004 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
15.10.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.10.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
12.10.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.10.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
29.09.2004 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 2
24.09.2004 Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
24.09.2004 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
24.09.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
22.09.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.09.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
21.09.2004 F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet Appeal 1
21.09.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 30
21.09.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
21.09.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.09.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
21.09.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
20.09.2004 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.09.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 46
20.09.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 30
20.09.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
20.09.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
20.09.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
11.06.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.06.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.05.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.05.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
26.05.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.05.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
24.05.2004 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
18.05.2004 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
18.02.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
09.01.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.12.2002 Claims Appeal 3
27.12.2002 Claims Appeal 3
27.12.2002 Claims Appeal 3
27.12.2002 Claims Appeal 2
27.12.2002 Claims Appeal 4
27.12.2002 Claims Appeal 3
27.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
23.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
27.11.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
27.11.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.11.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
23.11.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.11.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
21.11.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
18.11.2002 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
20.11.2000 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
30.08.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
30.08.2000 Communication of amended entries Appeal 2
30.08.2000 Communication of amended entries Appeal 2
24.08.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.08.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.08.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 19
03.08.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
03.08.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.08.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
03.08.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.05.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
24.05.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.04.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
29.03.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.02.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
26.01.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.11.1999 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.11.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
23.09.1999 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.09.1999 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
10.09.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 57
10.09.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
10.09.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
10.09.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
10.09.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
10.09.1999 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 18
14.07.1999 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
14.07.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
30.06.1999 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
29.06.1999 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
08.05.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.05.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.05.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.05.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.04.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
30.04.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
30.04.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
30.04.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
30.04.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
30.04.1999 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
30.04.1999 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 6
30.04.1999 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.04.1999 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.04.1999 Text intended for grant Opposition 14
15.04.1999 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
22.01.1999 Claims Opposition 4
22.01.1999 Claims Opposition 3
22.01.1999 Claims Opposition 3
22.01.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 10
15.12.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.12.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
30.11.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
18.09.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.09.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.09.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.09.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.09.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
11.09.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
11.09.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
17.08.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.08.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.08.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.08.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.07.1998 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.01.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.12.1997 Claims Opposition 3
19.12.1997 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 17
24.11.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.11.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
13.11.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
18.07.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
18.07.1997 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.07.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.07.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.07.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
09.06.1997 Request for documents Opposition 1
15.05.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.05.1997 Request for documents Opposition 1
09.05.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
07.05.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.05.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
07.05.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
07.05.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
07.05.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
07.05.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
07.05.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
30.04.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
30.04.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
20.06.1996 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
20.03.1996 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.03.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
20.03.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
29.01.1996 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
08.12.1995 Description Search / examination 8
08.12.1995 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.10.1995 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
25.09.1995 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
29.06.1995 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
13.06.1995 Request for change of address of the applicant Search / examination 1
02.06.1995 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
02.06.1995 Text intended for grant Search / examination 28
12.04.1995 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
16.03.1995 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
21.02.1995 Claims Search / examination 3
21.02.1995 Description Search / examination 5
21.02.1995 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.01.1995 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.12.1994 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.10.1994 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
20.04.1994 Claims Search / examination 4
20.04.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
15.02.1994 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
08.02.1994 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.10.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
19.03.1991 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
25.01.1991 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
22.01.1991 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.01.1991 European search report Search / examination 6
19.09.1990 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
12.09.1990 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.09.1990 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.07.1990 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
02.07.1990 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.05.1990 Annex Search / examination 14
25.05.1990 Annex Search / examination 9
25.05.1990 Annex Search / examination 33
25.05.1990 Annex Search / examination 2
25.05.1990 Claims Search / examination 5
25.05.1990 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
08.05.1990 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
08.05.1990 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
12.09.1989 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
01.08.1989 Priority document Search / examination 32
12.07.1989 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
15.06.1989 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
15.06.1989 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 34
17.01.1989 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1