EP0425485 - PREPARATION OF POLYMERIC SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SurModics, Inc. 9924 West 74th Street Eden Prairie, MN 55344-3523 / US | [2000/01] |
Former [1995/39] | For all designated states BSI Corporation 9924 West 74th Street Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | ||
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states BIO-METRIC SYSTEMS, INC. 9924 West 74th Street Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | ||
Former [1991/19] | For all designated states BIO-METRIC SYSTEMS, INC. 9924 West 74th Street Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUIRE, Patrick, E. 6741 Tartan Curve Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | 02 /
DUNKIRK, Shawn, G. 8933 Darnell Road Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | 03 /
JOSEPHSON, Mark, W. 6515 Logan Avenue South Richfield, MN 55423 / US | 04 /
SWANSON, Melvin, J. 5290 Mt. Carmel Road Carver, MN 55315 / US | [1991/19] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1991/19] | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89901480.7 | 15.12.1988 | [1991/19] | WO1988US04487 | Priority number, date | US19880223149 | 22.07.1988 Original published format: US 223149 | [1991/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9000887 | Date: | 08.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0425485 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0425485 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.02.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/02, A61F2/54 | [1991/19] | CPC: |
A61L33/0011 (EP);
A61L27/34 (EP);
G02B1/043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/19] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON POLYMEREN OBERFLÄCHEN | [1991/19] | English: | PREPARATION OF POLYMERIC SURFACES | [1991/19] | French: | PREPARATION DE SURFACES POLYMERES | [1991/19] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.1991 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.1991 | Search fee paid | 28.01.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 22.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 04.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/38] | Request for further processing for: | 08.07.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 08.07.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.07.1999 | Decision despatched | 21.02.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 21.02.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 10.03.1997 | Decision despatched | 09.12.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 09.12.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 16.01.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2000 | BE | 04.10.2000 | CH | 04.10.2000 | LI | 04.10.2000 | NL | 04.10.2000 | LU | 15.12.2000 | SE | 04.01.2001 | [2005/23] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 04.10.2000 | |
BE | 04.10.2000 | ||
CH | 04.10.2000 | ||
LI | 04.10.2000 | ||
NL | 04.10.2000 | ||
SE | 04.01.2001 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 04.10.2000 | |
BE | 04.10.2000 | ||
CH | 04.10.2000 | ||
LI | 04.10.2000 | ||
SE | 04.01.2001 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 04.10.2000 | |
BE | 04.10.2000 | ||
SE | 04.01.2001 | ||
Former [2001/51] | AT | 04.10.2000 | |
SE | 04.01.2001 | ||
Former [2001/37] | AT | 04.10.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4373009 (WINN R ALASTAIR); | [A]US4678468 (HIROYOSHI TOSHIKI [JP]) | International search | [X]US3826678 (HOFFMAN A, et al); | [X]US3955012 (OKAMURA SEIZO, et al); | [X]US4722906 (GUIRE PATRICK E [US]); | [X]WO8802623 (BIO METRIC SYSTEMS INC [US]) |