Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0409877

EP0409877 - KNEE-JOINT PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.12.1993
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AB Astra
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[N/P]
Former [1992/51]For all designated states
AB Astra
S-151 85 Södertälje / SE
Former [1991/05]For all designated states
Albrektsson, Björn
Wikander, Värslevägen 39
S-436 43 Askim / SE
For all designated states
WENNBERG, Stig
Villa Holma P1 16266
S-424 57 Angered / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Albrektsson, Björn
Wikander, Värslevägen 39
S-436 43 Askim / SE
02 / Wennberg, Stig
Villa Holma P1 16266
S-424 57 Angered / SE
[1992/50]
Former [1991/05]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Mossmark, Anders Lennart , et al
Zacco Sweden AB
Torggatan 8
Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [1991/05]Mossmark, Anders , et al
Albihn West AB, Box 142
S-401 22 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date89904644.511.04.1989
[1991/05]
WO1989SE00193
Priority number, dateSE1988000131111.04.1988         Original published format: SE 8801311
[1991/05]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO8909578
Date:19.10.1989
Language:EN
[1989/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0409877
Date:30.01.1991
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.1989
[1991/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0409877
Date:10.02.1993
Language:EN
[1993/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE19.10.1989
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/38
[1991/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1991/05]
TitleGerman:KNIEGELENKSPROTHESE[1991/05]
English:KNEE-JOINT PROSTHESIS[1991/05]
French:PROTHESE D'ARTICULATION DU GENOU[1991/05]
Entry into regional phase27.09.1990Translation filed 
25.09.1990National basic fee paid 
25.09.1990Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.1990Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.10.1989Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
27.09.1990Examination requested  [1991/05]
10.04.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.08.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.1992Fee for grant paid
03.11.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.11.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1994/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
09.04.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE10.02.1993
FR10.02.1993
IT10.02.1993
NL10.02.1993
SE10.02.1993
LU30.04.1993
[2008/01]
Former [2006/14]BE10.02.1993
FR10.02.1993
IT10.02.1993
NL10.02.1993
SE10.02.1993
LU30.04.1993
Former [2000/06]BE10.02.1993
IT10.02.1993
NL10.02.1993
SE10.02.1993
LU30.04.1993
FR02.07.1993
Former [1999/42]BE10.02.1993
IT10.02.1993
NL10.02.1993
SE10.02.1993
FR02.07.1993
Former [1994/23]BE10.02.1993
NL10.02.1993
SE10.02.1993
FR02.07.1993
Former [1993/47]BE10.02.1993
NL10.02.1993
SE10.02.1993
Former [1993/38]NL10.02.1993
SE10.02.1993
Former [1993/36]SE10.02.1993
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0183669
 [A]US4309778
 [A]US4673408