Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0372032

EP0372032 - ADJUSTING ARRANGEMENT FOR A SLATTED BASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  01.02.2002
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dewert Antriebs- und Systemtechnik GmbH & Co. KG
Weststrasse 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/20]For all designated states
Dewert Antriebs- und Systemtechnik GmbH & Co. KG
Weststrasse 1
D-32278 Kirchlengern / DE
Former [1990/24]For all designated states
DEWERT, Eckhart
Dorfstrasse 155
D-32130 Enger / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dewert, Eckhart
Dorfstrasse 155
D-32130 Enger / DE
 [2002/12]
Former [1990/24]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Stracke, Alexander , et al
Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/12]Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Jöllenbecker Strasse 164
33613 Bielefeld / DE
Former [1990/24]Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing.
Jöllenbecker Strasse 164
D-33613 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date89905055.306.05.1989
[1990/24]
WO1989DE00290
Priority number, dateDE19880006094U07.05.1988         Original published format: DE 8806094 U
[1990/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO8910715
Date:16.11.1989
Language:DE
[1989/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0372032
Date:13.06.1990
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.1989
[1990/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0372032
Date:13.05.1992
Language:DE
[1992/20]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0372032
Date:20.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.11.1989
ClassificationInternational:A47C20/04, A47C20/08
[1990/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1990/24]
TitleGerman:VERSTELLEINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN LATTENROST[1990/24]
English:ADJUSTING ARRANGEMENT FOR A SLATTED BASE[1990/24]
French:AGENCEMENT DE REGLAGE DE GRILLES EN LATTES[1990/24]
Entry into regional phase28.10.1989National basic fee paid 
28.10.1989Designation fee(s) paid 
28.10.1989Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.10.1989Examination requested  [1990/24]
09.07.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.10.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.1991Fee for grant paid
19.12.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.02.1993  16.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
OKIN Gesellschaft für Antriebstechnik mbH
Zur Merhardt 9
D-51645 Gummersbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Stachow, Ernst-Walther
Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Frankenforster Strasse 135-137
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1993/14]
Opponent(s)01  15.02.1993  16.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
OKIN Gesellschaft für Antriebstechnik mbH
Zur Merhardt 9
D-51645 Gummersbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Stachow, Ernst-Walther, Prof. Dr.
Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner, Patentanwälte, Frankenforster Strasse 135-137
D-51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
22.03.1993Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.10.1993Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.02.1995Date of oral proceedings
04.05.1995Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.05.1995Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
08.08.2001Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.08.2001Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
22.10.2001Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
12.12.2001Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition23.06.1995Appeal received No.  T0535/95
04.09.1995Statement of grounds filed
30.04.1998Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M05) [1998/18]
30.11.1998Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1998/49]
22.01.1999Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1999/04]
05.12.2000Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2000/50]
03.04.2001Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2001/14]
08.08.2001Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
08.08.2001Date of oral proceedings
13.08.2001Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
08.04.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU06.05.2001
[2004/39]
Cited inInternational searchDE8711567U  [ ];
 CH421382  [ ];
 US4499618  [ ];
 EP0079998  [ ]