Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0372032 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0372032



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1006
07.02.2002 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
07.02.2002 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
01.02.2002 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
12.12.2001 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
12.12.2001 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
12.12.2001 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
22.10.2001 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
22.10.2001 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
22.10.2001 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
22.10.2001 Text intended for grant Opposition 13
16.10.2001 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
13.08.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
08.08.2001 Claims Appeal 2
08.08.2001 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 18
08.08.2001 Description Appeal 1
08.08.2001 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
25.05.2001 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.05.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
18.05.2001 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
04.04.2001 Annex to a communication Appeal 2
04.04.2001 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
04.04.2001 Description Appeal 1
04.04.2001 Drawings Appeal 2
04.04.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
03.04.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
02.02.2001 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
25.01.2001 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
05.12.2000 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 6
10.10.2000 Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
19.07.2000 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
14.07.2000 Communication (no form) Appeal 3
12.07.2000 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 28
21.06.2000 Authorisation Appeal 1
21.06.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.04.2000 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.04.2000 Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 4
28.03.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.03.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.03.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
24.03.2000 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 3
09.03.2000 Refund of fees Opposition 1
27.10.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
03.09.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
28.08.1999 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
31.05.1999 Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 2
27.05.1999 Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
19.05.1999 Composition of the board Appeal 1
23.04.1999 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.04.1999 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
12.04.1999 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
04.03.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
22.01.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.01.1999 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 2
18.01.1999 Note of consultation between member and appellant / representative Appeal 1
30.11.1998 Annex to a communication Appeal 1
30.11.1998 Annex to a communication Appeal 1
30.11.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
30.11.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
30.11.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
18.09.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
15.09.1998 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
11.09.1998 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
11.08.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
28.07.1998 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
24.07.1998 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
30.04.1998 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 5
12.12.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.03.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.03.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.03.1996 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
13.03.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
12.03.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
08.03.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
22.01.1996 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
22.01.1996 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
11.01.1996 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
10.01.1996 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
11.09.1995 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
06.09.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
05.09.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.09.1995 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
07.07.1995 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
05.07.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.07.1995 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
01.07.1995 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
23.06.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.06.1995 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
19.05.1995 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 5
15.05.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
15.05.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.05.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
09.05.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.05.1995 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
04.05.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 37
04.05.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 12
04.05.1995 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
04.05.1995 Means of redress Opposition 1
04.05.1995 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
03.05.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.05.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.04.1995 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
27.03.1995 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
05.02.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.02.1995 Authorisation Opposition 1
02.02.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.02.1995 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.01.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 3
26.01.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
25.01.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.01.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.01.1995 Authorisation Opposition 1
24.01.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.01.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.01.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.01.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.01.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.01.1995 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
16.01.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.01.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.01.1995 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 1
11.01.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
11.01.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.01.1995 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 2
09.01.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.01.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.01.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.01.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.01.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
05.01.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.01.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
04.01.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.01.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.01.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.01.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.01.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.01.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.01.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
31.12.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.12.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.12.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.12.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
29.12.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.12.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.12.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
28.12.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.12.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.12.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.12.1994 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
23.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.12.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
23.12.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
23.12.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
23.12.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
23.12.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
23.12.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
23.12.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
23.12.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
23.12.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
23.12.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
23.12.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
23.12.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 3
23.12.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
23.12.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 3
17.12.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.12.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.12.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
14.12.1994 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
14.12.1994 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
14.12.1994 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
14.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
14.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
14.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.12.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
08.12.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
08.12.1994 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
07.12.1994 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
02.12.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.12.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
01.12.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
07.11.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
04.11.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
04.11.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.11.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.11.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
02.11.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
31.10.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.10.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 7
31.10.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 6
31.10.1994 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
31.10.1994 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
31.10.1994 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
25.10.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
24.10.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
05.10.1994 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.10.1994 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.09.1994 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.07.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.06.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
30.06.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
30.06.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
30.06.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
30.06.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
30.06.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
30.06.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
30.06.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
30.06.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
30.06.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
30.06.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
30.06.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
30.06.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 19
30.06.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.06.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
31.05.1994 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
30.05.1994 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
22.04.1994 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.04.1994 Communication about missing advice of delivery Search / examination 1
06.04.1994 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
06.04.1994 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
21.03.1994 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
15.03.1994 Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them Search / examination 1
02.03.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
28.02.1994 Request for assignment Search / examination 4
19.11.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
03.11.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.10.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
23.10.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
23.10.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
23.10.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
23.10.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 15
23.10.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.10.1993 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
23.10.1993 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 18
20.10.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 22
20.10.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
20.10.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.10.1993 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 18
29.09.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.09.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
21.09.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.07.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
24.06.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.03.1993 Authorisation Opposition 1
23.03.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.03.1993 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
22.03.1993 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.02.1993 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
17.02.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
17.02.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
17.02.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
17.02.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
17.02.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
17.02.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
17.02.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
17.02.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
17.02.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
17.02.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
17.02.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
15.02.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 18
15.02.1993 Non-scannable object Opposition 2
15.02.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
15.02.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
15.02.1993 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
15.02.1993 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
10.02.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.12.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.05.1992 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
07.04.1992 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
19.12.1991 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.12.1991 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
19.12.1991 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
21.11.1991 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
31.10.1991 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
25.10.1991 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
18.10.1991 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
09.10.1991 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.09.1991 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
05.08.1991 Claims Search / examination 1
05.08.1991 Description Search / examination 3
05.08.1991 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.08.1991 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
09.07.1991 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
04.05.1990 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.12.1989 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
16.11.1989 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
16.11.1989 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 36
16.11.1989 Priority document Search / examination 26
15.11.1989 Authorisation Search / examination 1
15.11.1989 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
28.10.1989 Annex Search / examination 1
28.10.1989 Claims Search / examination 3
28.10.1989 Claims Search / examination 3
28.10.1989 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.05.1989 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
06.05.1989 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 42
06.05.1989 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 42
06.05.1989 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
06.05.1989 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
06.05.1989 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
06.05.1989 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12