blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0370092

EP0370092 - SHOVEL STRETCHER FOR TRANSPORTING AN INJURED PERSON [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.1993
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FICKLER, Hans
Weidstrasse 18
CH-8542 Wiesendangen / CH
[1990/22]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1990/22]
Representative(s)Feldmann, Clarence Paul
Schneider Feldmann AG
Patent- und Markenanwälte
Beethovenstrasse 49
Postfach
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1990/22]Feldmann, Clarence Paul
c/o Patentanwaltsbüro FELDMANN AG Postfach Kanalstrasse 17
CH-8152 Glattbrugg / CH
Application number, filing date89905608.924.05.1989
[1990/22]
WO1989CH00095
Priority number, dateCH1988000200927.05.1988         Original published format: CH 200988
[1990/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO8911263
Date:30.11.1989
Language:DE
[1989/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0370092
Date:30.05.1990
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1990/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0370092
Date:07.01.1993
Language:DE
[1993/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.1989
ClassificationIPC:A61G1/00
[1990/22]
CPC:
A61G1/003 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1990/22]
TitleGerman:SCHAUFELBAHRE FUER DEN TRANSPORT EINER VERLETZTEN PERSON[1990/22]
English:SHOVEL STRETCHER FOR TRANSPORTING AN INJURED PERSON[1990/22]
French:BRANCARD EN FORME DE PELLE POUR TRANSPORTER DES BLESSES[1990/22]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Entry into regional phase22.01.1990National basic fee paid 
22.01.1990Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.1990Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.01.1990Examination requested  [1990/22]
13.06.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.08.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.07.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.08.1992Fee for grant paid
11.08.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.10.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE07.01.1993
FR07.01.1993
GB07.01.1993
IT07.01.1993
NL07.01.1993
SE07.01.1993
AT24.05.1993
LU31.05.1993
[2006/14]
Former [2000/06]BE07.01.1993
GB07.01.1993
IT07.01.1993
NL07.01.1993
SE07.01.1993
AT24.05.1993
FR28.05.1993
LU31.05.1993
Former [1999/42]BE07.01.1993
GB07.01.1993
IT07.01.1993
NL07.01.1993
SE07.01.1993
AT24.05.1993
FR28.05.1993
Former [1994/46]BE07.01.1993
GB07.01.1993
NL07.01.1993
SE07.01.1993
AT24.05.1993
FR28.05.1993
Former [1993/49]BE07.01.1993
GB07.01.1993
NL07.01.1993
SE07.01.1993
FR28.05.1993
Former [1993/48]BE07.01.1993
GB07.01.1993
NL07.01.1993
SE07.01.1993
Former [1993/38]BE07.01.1993
NL07.01.1993
SE07.01.1993
Former [1993/38]NL07.01.1993
SE07.01.1993
Former [1993/32]SE07.01.1993
Cited inInternational searchWO8800461  [ ] (FICKLER HANS [CH]);
 US2391928  [ ] (SEIB FREDERICK A);
 FR481154  [ ] (EUGENE ALEXIS ERNEST RICHARD [FR], et al);
 FR1319338  [ ];
 FR2098173  [ ] (FERNO WASHINGTON);
 EP0110851  [ ] (NORDBERG LARS)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.