Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0461110


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.10.2005 Change: Appeal number
24.03.1993 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  12.05.1993 [1993/19]
07.11.1991 Change - representative published on  27.12.1991 [1991/52]
01.11.1991 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.12.1991 [1991/51]
01.11.1991 Request for examination filed published on  18.12.1991 [1991/51]