Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0386222 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0386222



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 978
19.03.2004 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
11.03.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 25
26.09.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
29.08.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.08.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
22.08.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
22.08.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
21.08.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
14.08.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
19.02.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
19.02.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.02.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.02.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
11.02.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
11.02.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
06.02.2003 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
13.02.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
31.01.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
30.01.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
17.11.2000 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
17.11.2000 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
08.11.2000 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
15.09.2000 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
15.09.2000 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
12.09.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
31.07.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
31.07.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
20.07.2000 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
16.05.2000 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
12.05.2000 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
09.05.2000 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
09.05.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.03.2000 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
22.03.2000 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
22.03.2000 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 26
17.01.2000 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
17.01.2000 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
17.01.2000 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
30.12.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.12.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.12.1999 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
12.11.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
12.11.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
12.11.1999 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 3
12.11.1999 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 16
22.09.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
09.09.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
07.09.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
23.08.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.08.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.08.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
06.08.1999 Claims Opposition 1
06.08.1999 Claims Opposition 1
06.08.1999 Claims Opposition 1
06.08.1999 Claims Opposition 1
06.08.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.08.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
03.08.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
01.06.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.11.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.11.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
17.11.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.11.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.11.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
16.11.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.11.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.11.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.11.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.11.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.11.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
10.11.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
10.11.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
16.10.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.10.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.10.1998 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.10.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.10.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.10.1997 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.10.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
13.10.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
13.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 54
13.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.10.1997 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 7
10.10.1997 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 8
01.09.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
01.09.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
20.08.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.08.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.04.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.04.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 13
11.04.1997 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
04.02.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.01.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.01.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
09.01.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.01.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
09.01.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
09.01.1997 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 12
23.12.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
22.11.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.11.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.11.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
30.08.1996 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
23.08.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
23.08.1996 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
21.06.1996 Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting Opposition 1
21.06.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.06.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
25.04.1996 Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting Opposition 1
25.04.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.04.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
08.01.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.12.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
19.12.1995 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
08.12.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
08.11.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
08.11.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
08.11.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
08.11.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
08.11.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.11.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 22
08.11.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
08.11.1995 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
08.11.1995 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 136
08.11.1995 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.11.1995 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
08.11.1995 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
08.11.1995 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
08.11.1995 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
08.11.1995 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
08.11.1995 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
28.12.1994 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
24.10.1994 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.10.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
24.10.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
19.10.1994 Claims Search / examination 1
19.10.1994 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.10.1994 Brief communication with time limit Search / examination 1
29.09.1994 Claims Search / examination 1
29.09.1994 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
11.08.1994 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
21.06.1994 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 3
22.03.1994 Claims Search / examination 1
22.03.1994 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.12.1993 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
06.12.1993 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
15.11.1993 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
28.10.1993 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.10.1993 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
26.10.1993 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
10.09.1993 Claims Search / examination 2
10.09.1993 Claims Search / examination 2
10.09.1993 Description Search / examination 1
10.09.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
16.07.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
08.07.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.03.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
01.08.1990 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.07.1990 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
17.07.1990 Delay of examination for Euro-PCT applications with WTO/TRIPS priority Search / examination 1
25.04.1990 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
25.04.1990 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 2
25.04.1990 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
23.04.1990 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
30.03.1990 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.03.1990 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
29.03.1990 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
29.03.1990 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
28.03.1990 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
28.03.1990 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
22.03.1990 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 16
22.03.1990 Priority document Search / examination 14
14.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
12.10.1989 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1