Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0593418
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0593418Global Dossier 26.02.1997B1
EP0593418 27.04.1994A1
Priority number Date
EP8901424 24.11.1989
DE3839826 25.11.1988
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE58909779D 03.04.1997D1
Priority number Date
EP8901424 24.11.1989
DE58909779 24.11.1989
DE3839826 25.11.1988
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5430037 04.07.1995A
Priority number Date
US67174391 07.05.1991
DE3839826 25.11.1988
US540393 19.01.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5661154 26.08.1997A
Priority number Date
US67174391 07.05.1991
DE3839826 25.11.1988
US540393 19.01.1993
US38393995 06.02.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9006313Global Dossier 23.08.1990A3
WO9006313 14.06.1990A2
Priority number Date
DE3839826 25.11.1988
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT149166T 15.03.1997T
Priority number Date
DE3839826 25.11.1988
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE3839826 27.05.1993C2
DE3839826 31.05.1990A1
Priority number Date
DE3839826 25.11.1988
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2772717B 09.07.1998B2
JPH04502003 09.04.1992A
Priority number Date
DE3839826 25.11.1988