Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0593418

EP0593418 - ALKALI AND ALKALINE EARTH SALTS OF OXYPURINOL IN AMORPHOUS OR CRYSTALLINE FORM AS AGENTS FOR TREATING HYPERURICEMIA AND GOUT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.12.1997
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 12.06.2002  [2002/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henning Berlin Anlagen GmbH
Komturstrasse 58-62
D-12099 Berlin / DE
[1995/24]
Former [1994/17]For all designated states
HENNING BERLIN GmbH CHEMIE- UND PHARMAWERK
Komturstrasse 58-62
D-12099 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHEIFFELE, Ekkehard
Rottweiler Stra e 14
D-1000 Berlin 46 / DE
02 / Weickgenannt, Guido
Beerenstrasse 33
W-1000 Berlin 37 / DE
[1994/17]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/17]Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
D-50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date89913157.724.11.1989
[1994/17]
WO1989EP01424
Priority number, dateDE1988383982625.11.1988         Original published format: DE 3839826
[1994/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9006313
Date:14.06.1990
Language:DE
[1990/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0593418
Date:27.04.1994
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.1990
[1994/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0593418
Date:26.02.1997
Language:DE
[1997/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.06.1990
ClassificationInternational:C07D487/04, A61K31/505
[1994/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1994/17]
TitleGerman:ALKALI- UND ERDALKALISALZE DES OXIPURINOLS IN AMORPHER ODER KRISTALLINER FORM ALS MITTEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HYPERURIKÄMIE UND GICHT[1994/17]
English:ALKALI AND ALKALINE EARTH SALTS OF OXYPURINOL IN AMORPHOUS OR CRYSTALLINE FORM AS AGENTS FOR TREATING HYPERURICEMIA AND GOUT[1994/17]
French:UTILISATION DE SELS ALCALINS ET ALCALINO-TERREUX AMORPHES OU CRISTALLINS D'OXYPURINOL POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'HYPERURICEMIE ET DE LA GOUTTE[1994/17]
Entry into regional phase27.03.1991National basic fee paid 
27.03.1991Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.1991Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.1990Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
27.03.1991Examination requested  [1994/17]
13.03.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.05.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.1996Fee for grant paid
26.07.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.11.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1998/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
28.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
28.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES26.02.1997
[2002/24]
Cited inInternational searchEP0237348  [ ];
 GB975850  [ ]