blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0391029

EP0391029 - Method and device for controlling the speed of a diesel motor of a road finishing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.02.1994
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.02.1994Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.04.1994 [1994/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Joseph Vögele AG
Neckarauer Strasse 168-228
68146 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/41]For all designated states
Joseph Vögele AG
Neckarauer Strasse 168-228
D-68146 Mannheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Grundl, Roland, Dipl.-Ing. (FH)
Dellenweg 7
D-6901 Heiligkreuzsteinach / DE
[1990/41]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/41]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date90101422.524.01.1990
[1990/41]
Priority number, dateDE1989391140107.04.1989         Original published format: DE 3911401
[1990/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0391029
Date:10.10.1990
Language:DE
[1990/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0391029
Date:05.06.1991
Language:DE
[1991/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.04.1991
ClassificationIPC:F02D29/00
[1990/41]
CPC:
F02D29/00 (EP); F02D1/08 (EP); E01C2301/10 (EP);
F02B3/06 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1990/41]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Regeln der Drehzahl eines Dieselmotors eines Strassenfertigers[1990/41]
English:Method and device for controlling the speed of a diesel motor of a road finishing machine[1990/41]
French:Procédé et dispositif de régulation de la vitesse de rotation d'un moteur diesel d'une finisseuse de route[1990/41]
File destroyed:15.01.2000
Examination procedure05.09.1991Examination requested  [1991/45]
27.11.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.1993Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1994/14]
08.11.1993Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1994/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2502221  ;
 [A]EP0073288  (WEYHAUSEN KG MASCHF H [DE]);
 [A]DE3726333  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.