blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0392202

EP0392202 - Use of a fine crystalline iron-based alloy as a magnet core in an interface transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  15.12.2000
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vacuumschmelze GmbH
Grüner Weg 37
63450 Hanau / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/42]For all designated states
VACUUMSCHMELZE GMBH
Grüner Weg 37 Postfach 2253
D-63412 Hanau / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Binkofski, Johannes
Gartenstrasse 38
D-6459 Rodenbach / DE
02 / Grätzer, Dietmar
Königsberger Strasse 21
D-8756 Kahl / DE
03 / Herzer, Giselher, Dr.
Humperdinckweg 2
D-6450 Hanau / DE
04 / Hilzinger, Hans-Reiner, Dr.
Leipziger Strasse 65
D-6456 Langenselbold / DE
05 / Petzold, Jörg, Dr.
Varangeviller Strasse 2
D-6454 Bruchköbel / DE
[1990/42]
Representative(s)Neunert, Peter Andreas, et al
Patentanwälte
Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner
Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]Neunert, Peter Andreas, et al
Westphal - Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte Waldstrasse 33
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Former [2000/33](deleted)
Former [2000/03]Zedlitz, Peter, et al
Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17
80503 München / DE
Former [1996/06]Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing.
Postfach 22 13 17
D-80503 München / DE
Application number, filing date90104796.914.03.1990
[1990/42]
Priority number, dateDE1989391161808.04.1989         Original published format: DE 3911618
[1990/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0392202
Date:17.10.1990
Language:DE
[1990/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0392202
Date:03.04.1991
Language:DE
[1991/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0392202
Date:12.06.1996
Language:DE
[1996/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.1991
ClassificationIPC:H01F3/00, H01F1/153
[1990/42]
CPC:
H01F3/00 (EP,US); H01F1/15308 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1990/42]
TitleGerman:Verwendung einer feinkristallinen Eisen-Basis-Legierung als Magnetkernmaterial für einen Schnittstellen-Übertrager[1990/42]
English:Use of a fine crystalline iron-based alloy as a magnet core in an interface transformer[1990/42]
French:Application d'un alliage à base de fer, à cristallinité fine comme noyau magnétique pour un transformateur d'interface[1990/42]
Examination procedure20.09.1991Examination requested  [1991/47]
01.02.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.1994Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
14.09.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.09.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.1995Fee for grant paid
04.12.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination02.05.1994Appeal received No.  T0543/94
23.06.1994Statement of grounds filed
10.03.1995Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [1995/10]
23.05.1995Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1995/21]
04.09.1995Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.03.1997    WITHDRAWN
Widia GmbH
Münchener Strasse 90
45145 Essen / DE
Opponents representative
Vomberg, Friedhelm
RGTH
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Kaiserswerther Straße 215
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1997/18]
Opponent(s)01  04.03.1997    WITHDRAWN
Widia GmbH
Münchener Strasse 90
45145 Essen / DE
Opponents representative
Vomberg, Friedhelm
Schulstrasse 8
42653 Solingen / DE
Former [1997/17]
Opponent(s)01  04.03.1997   
Widia GmbH
Münchener Strasse 90
45145 Essen / DE
Opponents representative
Vomberg, Friedhelm
KLÖCKNER-WERKE AG Patentabteilung Klöcknerstrasse 29
47057 Duisburg / DE
18.04.1997Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.10.1997Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
11.09.1998Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
21.09.1998Legal effect of revocation of patent [2001/05]
Appeal following opposition10.11.1998Appeal received No.  T1066/98
10.11.1998Statement of grounds filed
02.10.2000Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
02.10.2000Date of oral proceedings
06.10.2000Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
07.03.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
03.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
21.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0299498  (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.