blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0391109

EP0391109 - Tear production measuring sheet and package therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.04.1996
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.06.1996 [1996/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Showa Yakuhin Kako Co., Ltd.
No. 16-5, 1-chome, Kyobashi Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1990/41]For all designated states
Showa Yakuhin Kako Co., Ltd.
No. 16-5, 1-chome, Kyobashi
Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nagase, Makoto
2-25-5 Sugesengoku, Tama-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Asami, Kuniaki
Arukasano-kugahara 202
1-16-10 Minamikugahara, Ota-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Kobayashi, Shuichi c/o Dai Nippon Print. Co.Ltd.
1-1, Ichigayakaga-cho, 1-chome
Shinjyuku-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Arai, Yasunori, c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd.
1-1, Ichigayakaga-cho, 1-chome
Shinjyuku-ku, Tokyo / JP
05 / Ito, Kazuo, c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd.
1-1, Ichigayakaga-cho, 1-chome
Shinjyuku-ku, Tokyo / JP
06 / Oka, Motohiro, c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd.
1-1, Ichigayakaga-cho, 1-chome
Shinjyuku-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1990/41]
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/41]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
D-80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date90105009.616.03.1990
[1990/41]
Priority number, dateJP1989003156720.03.1989         Original published format: JP 3156789
[1990/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0391109
Date:10.10.1990
Language:EN
[1990/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0391109
Date:27.03.1991
Language:EN
[1991/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0391109
Date:14.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.1991
ClassificationIPC:A61B5/00
[1990/41]
CPC:
A61B5/4261 (EP,US); A61B3/101 (EP,US); A61B2010/0067 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1990/41]
TitleGerman:Streifen zur Messung der Tränenproduktion und Verpackung dafür[1990/41]
English:Tear production measuring sheet and package therefor[1990/41]
French:Bande pour mesurer la production des larmes et son emballage[1990/41]
Examination procedure03.09.1991Examination requested  [1991/44]
02.08.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.02.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.05.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.06.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.11.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.1995Fee for grant paid
13.02.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.03.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XP]EP0330092  (SHOWA PHARM CHEM IND [JP]);
 [A]FR2182172  (HARCO ELECTR LTD [CA]);
 [X]US4168779  (YOKOKOJI SHYOJI, et al);
 [X]US3533548  (TATERKA MICHAEL);
 [X]GB1510384  (WARDWELL C)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.