Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0400313

EP0400313 - Multiple push-button switch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRW Automotive Electronics & Components GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 2-8
78315 Radolfzell / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/41]For all designated states
TRW Automotive Electronics & Components GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 2-8
78315 Radolfzell / DE
Former [1990/49]For all designated states
Priesemuth, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Postkamp 13
D-25524 Breitenburg-Nordoe / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Priesemuth, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Heberthal 1
83512 Wasserburg / DE
[1999/41]
Former [1990/49]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Eder, Thomas , et al
Eder Schieschke & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Elisabethstrasse 34/II
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/41]Eder, Thomas, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Eder & Schieschke, Patentanwälte, Elisabethstrasse 34
80796 München / DE
Former [1995/52]Barske, Heiko, Dr. rer. nat. , et al
Blumbach, Kramer & Partner Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43
D-81245 München / DE
Former [1995/27]Barske, Heiko, Dr.
Radeckestrasse 43
D-81245 München / DE
Former [1990/49]Niedmers, Ole, Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwälte Niedmers & Partner Stahltwiete 23
D-22761 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date90107158.914.04.1990
[1990/49]
Priority number, dateDE1989391763731.05.1989         Original published format: DE 3917637
[1990/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0400313
Date:05.12.1990
Language:DE
[1990/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0400313
Date:20.05.1992
Language:DE
[1992/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0400313
Date:03.04.1996
Language:DE
[1996/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.1992
ClassificationInternational:H01H23/30, H01H23/08, H02B1/42
[1992/21]
Former International [1990/49]H01H23/08, H02B1/42
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1990/49]
TitleGerman:Mehrfachtastschalter[1990/49]
English:Multiple push-button switch[1990/49]
French:Commutateur à touche multiple[1990/49]
Examination procedure17.11.1992Examination requested  [1993/02]
31.03.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.06.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.08.1995Fee for grant paid
29.08.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.09.1996   
Leopold Kostal GmbH & Co. KG
Wiesenstrasse 47
58507 Lüdenscheid / DE
 [1996/44]
06.02.1997Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.06.1997Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.10.1998Date of oral proceedings
11.11.1998Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.11.1998Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.11.2000Legal effect of revocation of patent [2001/03]
17.11.2000Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition26.11.1998Appeal received No.  T1135/98
25.02.1999Statement of grounds filed
14.11.2000Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
14.11.2000Date of oral proceedings
17.11.2000Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
19.04.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
09.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE03.04.1996
DK03.04.1996
FR03.04.1996
GR03.04.1996
IT03.04.1996
NL03.04.1996
AT14.04.1996
CH30.04.1996
LI30.04.1996
LU30.04.1996
SE03.07.1996
ES04.07.1996
[2004/38]
Former [2004/35]BE03.04.1996
DK03.04.1996
FR03.04.1996
GR03.04.1996
IT03.04.1996
NL03.04.1996
AT14.04.1996
CH30.04.1996
LI30.04.1996
LU30.04.1996
SE03.07.1996
Former [2003/07]BE03.04.1996
DK03.04.1996
GR03.04.1996
IT03.04.1996
NL03.04.1996
AT14.04.1996
CH30.04.1996
LI30.04.1996
LU30.04.1996
SE03.07.1996
FR30.08.1996
Former [2000/04]BE03.04.1996
DK03.04.1996
GR03.04.1996
IT03.04.1996
AT14.04.1996
CH30.04.1996
LI30.04.1996
LU30.04.1996
SE03.07.1996
FR30.08.1996
Former [1999/42]BE03.04.1996
DK03.04.1996
IT03.04.1996
AT14.04.1996
CH30.04.1996
LI30.04.1996
SE03.07.1996
FR30.08.1996
Former [1998/15]BE03.04.1996
DK03.04.1996
AT14.04.1996
CH30.04.1996
LI30.04.1996
SE03.07.1996
FR30.08.1996
Former [1998/04]BE03.04.1996
AT14.04.1996
CH30.04.1996
LI30.04.1996
SE03.07.1996
FR30.08.1996
Former [1997/42]BE03.04.1996
AT14.04.1996
SE03.07.1996
FR30.08.1996
Former [1997/20]BE03.04.1996
SE03.07.1996
FR30.08.1996
Former [1997/12]SE03.07.1996
FR30.08.1996
Former [1996/47]SE03.07.1996
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2622046  ;
 [Y]DE8408935U  ;
 [A]DE1092983  ;
 [A]US2916566