Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0398240

EP0398240 - High speed crosslapper [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [1990/47]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Freund, Kenneth Stephen
215 Lake Terrace Drive
Hendersonville, Tennessee 37045 / US
[1990/47]
Representative(s)Abitz, Walter , et al
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09
81628 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/47]Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09
D-81628 München / DE
Application number, filing date90109117.315.05.1990
[1990/47]
Priority number, dateUS1989035191815.05.1989         Original published format: US 351918
[1990/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0398240
Date:22.11.1990
Language:EN
[1990/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0398240
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.1990
ClassificationInternational:D01G15/44
[1990/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU,   NL [1990/47]
TitleGerman:Vlieskreuzbandleger[1990/47]
English:High speed crosslapper[1990/47]
French:Plieuse pour nappes, en particulier en croix[1990/47]
Examination procedure19.09.1990Examination requested  [1990/47]
30.06.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.08.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.1994Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
15.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.1999Fee for grant paid
22.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination03.06.1994Appeal received No.  T0707/94
21.07.1994Statement of grounds filed
15.04.1999Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
15.04.1999Date of oral proceedings
05.05.1999Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
25.04.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
25.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 07
25.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 08
27.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 09
26.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.02.2000
BE09.02.2000
NL09.02.2000
LU15.05.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2003/07]AT09.02.2000
BE09.02.2000
NL09.02.2000
Former [2001/08]AT09.02.2000
BE09.02.2000
Documents cited:Search[AD]GB1527230  (WIRA & MATHER);
 [AD]US3877628  (ASSELIN ROBERT, et al);
 [AD]US3906588  (ZAFIROGLU DIMITRI P);
 [A]US3638279  (SWADOS HARRISON G)