EP0402655 - Floating friction brake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1994 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motion Control Industries, Inc. Gillis Avenue Ridgway, Pennsylvania 15853 / US | [1991/41] |
Former [1990/51] | For all designated states THE B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY 3925 Embassy Parkway Akron Ohio 44313-1799 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Redenbarger, Philip Dale Rural Rt. No. 2 Centerpoint, Indiana 47840 / US | [1990/51] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 90109403.7 | 18.05.1990 | [1990/51] | Priority number, date | US19890367415 | 16.06.1989 Original published format: US 367415 | [1990/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0402655 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0402655 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16D55/227, F16D65/16 | [1990/51] | CPC: |
F16D65/18 (EP,US);
F16D55/227 (EP,US);
F16D65/42 (EP,US);
F16D2055/007 (EP,US);
F16D2121/14 (EP,US);
F16D2125/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/51] | Title | German: | Schwimmende Reibungsbremse | [1990/51] | English: | Floating friction brake | [1990/51] | French: | Frein à friction flottant | [1990/51] | Examination procedure | 08.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 25.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.02.1994 | BE | 02.02.1994 | CH | 02.02.1994 | DE | 02.02.1994 | ES | 02.02.1994 | FR | 02.02.1994 | GR | 02.02.1994 | IT | 02.02.1994 | LI | 02.02.1994 | NL | 02.02.1994 | SE | 02.02.1994 | GB | 18.05.1994 | LU | 31.05.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 02.02.1994 | |
BE | 02.02.1994 | ||
CH | 02.02.1994 | ||
DE | 02.02.1994 | ||
ES | 02.02.1994 | ||
GR | 02.02.1994 | ||
IT | 02.02.1994 | ||
LI | 02.02.1994 | ||
NL | 02.02.1994 | ||
SE | 02.02.1994 | ||
GB | 18.05.1994 | ||
LU | 31.05.1994 | ||
FR | 24.06.1994 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 02.02.1994 | |
BE | 02.02.1994 | ||
CH | 02.02.1994 | ||
DE | 02.02.1994 | ||
GR | 02.02.1994 | ||
IT | 02.02.1994 | ||
LI | 02.02.1994 | ||
NL | 02.02.1994 | ||
SE | 02.02.1994 | ||
GB | 18.05.1994 | ||
LU | 31.05.1994 | ||
FR | 24.06.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 02.02.1994 | |
BE | 02.02.1994 | ||
CH | 02.02.1994 | ||
DE | 02.02.1994 | ||
IT | 02.02.1994 | ||
LI | 02.02.1994 | ||
NL | 02.02.1994 | ||
SE | 02.02.1994 | ||
GB | 18.05.1994 | ||
FR | 24.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/19] | AT | 02.02.1994 | |
BE | 02.02.1994 | ||
CH | 02.02.1994 | ||
DE | 02.02.1994 | ||
LI | 02.02.1994 | ||
NL | 02.02.1994 | ||
SE | 02.02.1994 | ||
GB | 18.05.1994 | ||
FR | 24.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/10] | AT | 02.02.1994 | |
BE | 02.02.1994 | ||
CH | 02.02.1994 | ||
DE | 02.02.1994 | ||
LI | 02.02.1994 | ||
NL | 02.02.1994 | ||
SE | 02.02.1994 | ||
FR | 24.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/04] | AT | 02.02.1994 | |
BE | 02.02.1994 | ||
CH | 02.02.1994 | ||
DE | 02.02.1994 | ||
LI | 02.02.1994 | ||
SE | 02.02.1994 | ||
FR | 24.06.1994 | ||
Former [1994/49] | AT | 02.02.1994 | |
BE | 02.02.1994 | ||
CH | 02.02.1994 | ||
DE | 02.02.1994 | ||
LI | 02.02.1994 | ||
SE | 02.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/47] | AT | 02.02.1994 | |
CH | 02.02.1994 | ||
DE | 02.02.1994 | ||
LI | 02.02.1994 | ||
SE | 02.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/46] | AT | 02.02.1994 | |
DE | 02.02.1994 | ||
SE | 02.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | DE | 02.02.1994 | |
SE | 02.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | SE | 02.02.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3613837 (TSUBOUCHI KAORU); | [A]US4036330 (HENNING DALE A, et al); | [Y]DE2832443 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [Y]US4491203 (MONICK FREDERICK R [US]) |