Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0399540

EP0399540 - Method and device for wrapping products in a hood of stretchable film and packaging unit shaped with this [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  19.05.2000
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bernhard Beumer Maschinenfabrik KG
Oelder Strasse 40
D-59269 Beckum / DE
[1990/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Aufenvenne, Martin
Märkische Strasse 3
D-4724 Wadersloh / DE
[1990/48]
Representative(s)Hoormann, Walter R. , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/48]Hoormann, Walter, Dr.-Ing. , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
D-80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date90109925.925.05.1990
[1990/48]
Priority number, dateDE1989391711026.05.1989         Original published format: DE 3917110
[1990/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0399540
Date:28.11.1990
Language:DE
[1990/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0399540
Date:08.12.1993
Language:DE
[1993/49]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0399540
Date:05.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.1990
ClassificationInternational:B65B9/13
[1990/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   LI,   LU,   NL [1990/48]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Umhüllen von Stückgut mit einer Stretchfolienhaube und hiermit zu bildende Verpackungseinheit[1990/48]
English:Method and device for wrapping products in a hood of stretchable film and packaging unit shaped with this[1990/48]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour envelopper des marchandises avec une housse de film étirable et ensemble d'emballage formé avec ceux-ci[1990/48]
Examination procedure19.10.1990Examination requested  [1990/52]
26.02.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.03.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.06.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.1993Fee for grant paid
22.07.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.05.1994  16.10.1996  WITHDRAWN
Kurt Lachenmeier A/S KL Industrimaskiner
Fynsgade 8-10
DK-6400 Sönderborg / DK
Opponent's representative
Grosse, Wolfgang
Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Nymphenburger Straße 14
80335 München / DE
 02  20.07.1994  04.08.1994  ADMISSIBLE
Maschinenfabrik Möllers GmbH u. Co.
Sudhoferweg 93
D-59269 Beckum / DE
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 03  27.08.1994  07.09.1994  ADMISSIBLE
MSK-Verpackungs-Systeme GmbH
Benzstrasse
D-47533 Kleve / DE
Opponent's representative
Stark, Walter
Moerser Strasse 140
47803 Krefeld / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2000/22]
Opponent(s)01  10.05.1994  16.10.1996  WITHDRAWN
Kurt Lachenmeier A/S KL Industrimaskiner
Fynsgade 8-10
DK-6400 Sönderborg / DK
Opponent's representative
Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse - Bockhorni & Partner, Forstenrieder Allee 59
81476 München / DE
 02  20.07.1994  04.08.1994  ADMISSIBLE
Maschinenfabrik Möllers GmbH u. Co.
Sudhoferweg 93
D-59269 Beckum / DE
Opponent's representative
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
 03  27.08.1994  07.09.1994  ADMISSIBLE
MSK-Verpackungs-Systeme GmbH
Benzstrasse
D-47533 Kleve / DE
Opponent's representative
Stark, Walter, Dr.-Ing.
Moerser Strasse 140
D-47803 Krefeld / DE
Former [1998/15]
Opponent(s)01  10.05.1994  26.05.1994  ADMISSIBLE
Kurt Lachenmeier A/S KL Industrimaskiner
Fynsgade 8-10
DK-6400 Sönderborg / DK
Opponent's representative
Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59
D-81476 München / DE
 02  20.07.1994  04.08.1994  ADMISSIBLE
Maschinenfabrik Möllers GmbH u. Co.
Sudhoferweg 93
D-59269 Beckum / DE
Opponent's representative
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
 03  27.08.1994  07.09.1994  ADMISSIBLE
MSK-Verpackungs-Systeme GmbH
Benzstrasse
D-47533 Kleve / DE
Opponent's representative
Stark, Walter, Dr.-Ing.
Moerser Strasse 140
D-47803 Krefeld / DE
Former [1994/42]
Opponent(s)01  10.05.1994  26.05.1994  ADMISSIBLE
Kurt Lachenmeier A/S KL Industrimaskiner
Fynsgade 8-10
DK-6400 Sönderborg / DK
Opponent's representative
Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59
D-81476 München / DE
 02  20.07.1994  04.08.1994  ADMISSIBLE
Maschinenfabrik Möllers GmbH u. Co.
Sudhoferweg 93
D-59269 Beckum / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner
Westenhellweg 67
D-44137 Dortmund / DE
 03  27.08.1994  07.09.1994  ADMISSIBLE
MSK-Verpackungs-Systeme GmbH
Benzstrasse
D-47533 Kleve / DE
Opponent's representative
Stark, Walter, Dr.-Ing.
Moerser Strasse 140
D-47803 Krefeld / DE
Former [1994/37]
Opponent(s)01  10.05.1994  26.05.1994  ADMISSIBLE
Kurt Lachenmeier A/S KL Industrimaskiner
Fynsgade 8-10
DK-6400 Sönderborg / DK
Opponent's representative
Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59
D-81476 München / DE
 02  20.07.1994  04.08.1994  ADMISSIBLE
Maschinenfabrik Möllers GmbH u. Co.
Sudhoferweg 93
D-59269 Beckum / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner
Westenhellweg 67
D-44137 Dortmund / DE
Former [1994/27]
Opponent(s)01  10.05.1994  26.05.1994  ADMISSIBLE
Kurt Lachenmeier A/S KL Industrimaskiner
Fynsgade 8-10
DK-6400 Sönderborg / DK
Opponent's representative
Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59
D-81476 München / DE
09.11.1994Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.05.1995Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.09.1995Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
01.02.1996Reply to a communication from the opposition division
16.10.1996Date of oral proceedings
26.11.1996Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.11.1996Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.01.2000Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.01.2000Date of oral proceedings
17.02.2000Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.02.2000Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
16.03.2000Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition03.12.1996Appeal received No.  T1047/96
03.04.1997Statement of grounds filed
24.01.2000Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0285855  (LACHENMEIER KURT APS [DK]);
 [A]DE8808508U  ;
 [A]DE2706955  (KELLER GMBH & CO KG);
 [A]US4050219  (HIGGINS DAVID M);
 [A]AU19447B