blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0402701

EP0402701 - Process and apparatus for making of a light waveguide [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.01.1994
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.03.1994 [1994/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
kabelmetal electro GmbH
Postfach 260
30002 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/51]For all designated states
kabelmetal electro GmbH
Postfach 260
D-30002 Hannover / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Lautenbach, Wolfgang
Rosensteinstrasse 12
D-7252 Weil der Stadt / DE
[1990/51]
Application number, filing date90110218.630.05.1990
[1990/51]
Priority number, dateDE1989391906710.06.1989         Original published format: DE 3919067
[1990/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0402701
Date:19.12.1990
Language:DE
[1990/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0402701
Date:20.03.1991
Language:DE
[1991/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0402701
Date:17.03.1993
Language:DE
[1993/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.1991
ClassificationIPC:C03C25/02
[1990/51]
CPC:
C03C25/12 (EP); C03C25/18 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT,   NL [1990/51]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Lichtwellenleiters[1990/51]
English:Process and apparatus for making of a light waveguide[1990/51]
French:Procédé et appareil de fabrication d'un guide d'ondes optique[1990/51]
Examination procedure18.02.1991Examination requested  [1991/16]
21.08.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.09.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.1992Fee for grant paid
17.09.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.12.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1994/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0198561  (PHILIPS NV [NL]);
 [A]GB2044751  (PHILIPS NV)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.