EP0459005 - Method and arrangement for the transmission of operational status information between centralised and decentralised devices of a communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1996 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.1996 [1996/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zwack, Eduard, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Lochhauser Strasse 86 D-8039 Puchheim / DE | 02 /
Strohmeier, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Partnachstrasse 1 D-8000 München 70 / DE | 03 /
Geissler, Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing. Gartenstrasse 28 D-8190 Wolfratshausen / DE | 04 /
Heitmann, Jürgen, Dr.-Ing. Bauweberstrasse 34 D-8000 München 71 / DE | [1991/49] | Application number, filing date | 90110485.1 | 01.06.1990 | [1991/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0459005 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0459005 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/12 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0407 (EP,US);
H04J3/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1991/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zum Übermitteln von Betriebszustandsinformationen zwischen zentralen und dezentralen Einrichtungen eines Kommunikationssystems | [1991/49] | English: | Method and arrangement for the transmission of operational status information between centralised and decentralised devices of a communication system | [1991/49] | French: | Méthode et arrangement de transmission d'information de l'état de fonctionnement entre les dispositifs centraux et décentralisés d'un système de communication | [1991/49] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 29.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4731781 (NAKAMURA AKI [JP]) | [YD] - TELCOM REPORT, 1985, Sonderheft, Seiten 55-66, Berlin, DE; G. BECKINGER et al.: "Hardware-Struktur des HICOM-Kommunikationscomputers" |