Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0465704

EP0465704 - Process for spacing of typefaces [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1992/03]Process for preparing characters
[1995/09]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.01.1996
Database last updated on 23.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
URW Software & Type GmbH
Harksheider Strasse 102
D-22399 Hamburg / DE
[1993/52]
Former [1992/03]For all designated states
URW Unternehmensberatung Karow Rubow Weber GmbH
Harksheider Strasse 102
D-22399 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Karow, Peter
Kreienkoppel 55
D-2000 Hamburg 65 / DE
02 / Kämmle, Bodo
Winsener Strasse 18
D-2359 Kisdorf / DE
03 / Albrecht, Margret
Kätnerweg 13 g
D-2000 Hamburg 65 / DE
[1995/09]
Former [1992/03]01 / Karow, Peter, Dr.
Kreienkoppel 55
D-2000 Hamburg 65 / DE
02 / Kämmle, Bodo
Winsener Strasse 18
D-2359 Kisdorf / DE
03 / Albrecht, Margret
Kätnerweg 13 g
D-2000 Hamburg 65 / DE
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/02]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
D-22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [1992/03]Walenda, Hans, Dipl.Ing. Dr. techn.
Berner Weg 28
D-2000 Hamburg 65 / DE
Application number, filing date90113252.211.07.1990
[1992/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0465704
Date:15.01.1992
Language:DE
[1992/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0465704
Date:01.03.1995
Language:DE
[1995/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.1991
ClassificationInternational:B41B25/00, B41B19/00, B41B23/00, G06K15/02
[1992/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1992/03]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Zurichtung von Schriften[1992/03]
English:Process for spacing of typefaces[1995/09]
French:Procédé pour l'interlettrage de caractères[1995/09]
Former [1992/03]Process for preparing characters
Former [1992/03]Procédé de préparation de caractères
Examination procedure25.06.1991Examination requested  [1992/03]
31.08.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.07.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.1994Fee for grant paid
04.10.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.12.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1996/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
16.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
18.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR01.03.1995
GB01.03.1995
[2006/14]
Former [1996/04]GB01.03.1995
FR28.07.1995
Former [1995/52]FR28.07.1995
Documents cited:Search[A]US4090187  ;
 [A]US3712443
 [A]  - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 28, Nr. 9, Februar 1986, Seiten 4081-4082, Armonk, NY, US; "Selective page-edge control for pseudo-kerned type fonts"