blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0415401

EP0415401 - Improved multiplicative signal correction method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.09.1998
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stark, Edward W.
160 West End Avenue, Suite 3M New York
New York 10023 / US
For all designated states
Martens, Harald
Gamle Vegen 13
N-1430 Aas / NO
[N/P]
Former [1991/10]For all designated states
Stark, Edward W.
160 West End Avenue, Suite 3M
New York, New York 10023 / US
For all designated states
Martens, Harald
Gamle Vegen 13
N-1430 Aas / NO
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1991/10]
Representative(s)Lusuardi, Werther
Dr. Lusuardi AG
Kreuzbühlstrasse 8
8008 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1991/10]Lusuardi, Werther Giovanni, Dr.
Dr. Lusuardi AG, Kreuzbühlstrasse 8
CH-8008 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date90116621.530.08.1990
[1991/10]
Priority number, dateUS1989040203801.09.1989         Original published format: US 402038
US1990057253428.08.1990         Original published format: US 572534
[1991/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0415401
Date:06.03.1991
Language:EN
[1991/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0415401
Date:02.02.1994
Language:EN
[1994/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0415401
Date:29.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.12.1993
ClassificationIPC:G01J3/28, G01N21/35
[1997/44]
CPC:
G01J3/28 (EP,US); G01J2003/1828 (EP,US); G01N2201/129 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1993/40]G01J3/28, G01N21/35, G06F15/20, G06F15/68
Former IPC [1991/10]G01J3/28, G01N21/35, G06F15/20
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1991/10]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Gerät zur Verbesserung eines Multipliziersignals[1991/10]
English:Improved multiplicative signal correction method and apparatus[1991/10]
French:Méthode et appareil pour la correction de signal multiplicatif[1991/10]
Examination procedure29.06.1994Examination requested  [1994/34]
17.11.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
13.07.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
24.07.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
04.02.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
11.02.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.05.1997Fee for grant paid
10.05.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.06.1997Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)30.07.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/43]
Request for further processing for:19.06.1997Request for further processing filed
12.06.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.06.1997Decision despatched
12.06.1997Request for further processing filed
12.06.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
27.06.1997Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
15.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
04.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
08.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 07
09.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.199405   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.1994
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH29.10.1997
DK29.10.1997
IT29.10.1997
LI29.10.1997
NL29.10.1997
SE29.01.1998
[2003/07]
Former [1999/42]CH29.10.1997
DK29.10.1997
IT29.10.1997
LI29.10.1997
SE29.01.1998
Former [1998/45]CH29.10.1997
DK29.10.1997
LI29.10.1997
SE29.01.1998
Former [1998/30]DK29.10.1997
SE29.01.1998
Former [1998/21]SE29.01.1998
Documents cited:Search[A]  - APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY. vol. 39, no. 4, July 1985, BALTIMORE US pages 641 - 646 IVERSEN 'multiplicative scatter correction'
 [AD]  - APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY. vol. 38, no. 3, 1984, BALTIMORE US pages 317 - 322 HONIGS ET AL. 'A new method for obtaining individual component spectra from those of complex mixtures'
 [AD]  - PROCEEDINGS OF NORDIC SYMPOSIUM ON APPLIED STATISTICS June 1983, NORWAY pages 205 - 234 MARTENS ET AL. 'multivariate linearity transformations for Nir spectroscopy'
 [X]  - LABORATORY MICROCOMPUTER vol. 7, no. 2, 1988, pages 74 - 75 MYERS 'unscrambler'
 [A]  - JOURNAL OF CHEMOMETRICS vol. 1, 1987, pages 201 - 219 MARTENS 'improved selectivity in spectroscopy by multivariate calibration'
 [AP]  - APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY. vol. 44, no. 5, June 1990, BALTIMORE US pages 895 - 898 MILLER ET AL. 'path-length correction method'
 [A]  - database INSPEC, access number 264984 kautz et al. ' cellular logic in-memory arrays' (may 70, USA)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.