blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0415459

EP0415459 - Friction material and method of manufacturing therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  29.01.1999
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2010Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 21.04.2010  [2010/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1991/11]For all designated states
SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP
Former [1991/10]For all designated states
SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka 541 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakagawa, Mitsuhiko, c/o Itami Works Sumitomo
Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP
02 / Yamashita, Yukinori, c/o Itami Works Sumitomo
Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP
03 / Kishimoto, Hiroya, c/o Itami Works Sumitomo
Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP
04 / Masanori, Ibuki c/o Itami Works Sumitomo
Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP
[1994/36]
Former [1991/10]01 / Nakagawa, Mitsuhiko, c/o Itami Works Sumitomo
Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP
02 / Yamashita, Yukinori, c/o Itami Works Sumitomo
Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP
03 / Kishimoto, Hiroya, c/o Itami Works Sumitomo
Electric Ind. Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP
Representative(s)Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner
Grosse Bockhorni Schumacher
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Elsenheimerstrasse 49
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/10]Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner, Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59
D-81476 München / DE
Application number, filing date90116880.703.09.1990
[1991/10]
Priority number, dateJP1989022815301.09.1989         Original published format: JP 22815389
JP1990022909129.08.1990         Original published format: JP 22909190
[1991/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0415459
Date:06.03.1991
Language:EN
[1991/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0415459
Date:22.05.1991
Language:EN
[1991/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0415459
Date:13.04.1994
Language:EN
[1994/15]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0415459
Date:17.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.04.1991
ClassificationIPC:F16D69/02
[1991/10]
CPC:
F16D69/00 (EP); F16D69/026 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1991/10]
TitleGerman:Reibungsmaterial und Verfahren zur Herstellung desselben[1991/10]
English:Friction material and method of manufacturing therefor[1991/10]
French:Matériau de friction et procédé de fabrication[1991/10]
Examination procedure19.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/10]
23.09.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.10.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.1994Fee for grant paid
07.01.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.01.1995  16.02.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Verband der Reibbelagindustrie e.V.
Höhenberger Strasse 30
D-51103 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/16]
Opponent(s)01  13.01.1995  16.02.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Verband der Reibbelagindustrie e.V.
Höhenberger Strasse 30
D-51103 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [1995/10]
Opponent(s)01  13.01.1995  16.02.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Verband der Reibbelagindustrie e.V.
Höhenberger Strasse 30
D-51103 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Dallmeyer, Georg (DE)
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Hauptbahnhof Postfach 10 22 41
D-50462 Köln / DE
23.01.1995No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
02.02.1995No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
21.02.1995Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.09.1995Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.03.1996Date of oral proceedings
01.04.1996Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.07.1998Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.07.1998Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.10.1998Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
29.12.1998Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition22.05.1996Appeal received No.  T0493/96
31.07.1996Statement of grounds filed
21.07.1998Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
21.07.1998Date of oral proceedings
28.07.1998Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XD]JP56098276  ;
 [Y]EP0000839  ;
 [Y]US4388423  ;
 [Y]GB2011448  ;
 [Y]DE2142995
 [XD]  - DERWENT FILE SUPPLIER WPIL, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-56 098 276 (FUJI BRAKE) 07-08-1981, & JP56098276 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.