Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0420263

EP0420263 - All purpose wheelchair [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.03.1996
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KARE CHAIR INDUSTRIES INC.
205 Ninth Street South South St. Paul
Minnesota 55075 / US
[N/P]
Former [1991/14]For all designated states
KARE CHAIR INDUSTRIES INC.
205 Ninth Street South
South St. Paul, Minnesota 55075 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Trkla, Theodore A.
205 Ninth Street South
South St. Paul, Minnesota 55075 / US
[1991/14]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Modiano Gardi Patents, Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1991/14]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Baaderstrasse 3
D-80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date90118664.328.09.1990
[1991/14]
Priority number, dateUS1989041475329.09.1989         Original published format: US 414753
[1991/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0420263
Date:03.04.1991
Language:EN
[1991/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0420263
Date:17.05.1995
Language:EN
[1995/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.1991
ClassificationInternational:A61G5/00
[1991/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1991/14]
TitleGerman:Rollstuhl für jeden Zweck[1991/14]
English:All purpose wheelchair[1991/14]
French:Fauteuil roulant à toutes fins[1991/14]
Examination procedure04.10.1991Examination requested  [1991/49]
05.03.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.09.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.03.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.05.1994Fee for grant paid
06.05.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
17.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
20.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.199405   M06   Fee paid on   20.02.1995
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.05.1995
BE17.05.1995
CH17.05.1995
DK17.05.1995
ES17.05.1995
FR17.05.1995
GR17.05.1995
IT17.05.1995
LI17.05.1995
NL17.05.1995
SE17.08.1995
GB28.09.1995
LU30.09.1995
[2006/14]
Former [2003/11]AT17.05.1995
BE17.05.1995
CH17.05.1995
DK17.05.1995
ES17.05.1995
GR17.05.1995
IT17.05.1995
LI17.05.1995
NL17.05.1995
SE17.08.1995
GB28.09.1995
LU30.09.1995
FR13.10.1995
Former [2002/24]AT17.05.1995
BE17.05.1995
CH17.05.1995
DK17.05.1995
ES17.05.1995
GR17.05.1995
IT17.05.1995
LI17.05.1995
SE17.08.1995
GB28.09.1995
LU30.09.1995
NL30.09.1995
FR13.10.1995
Former [2000/27]AT17.05.1995
BE17.05.1995
CH17.05.1995
DK17.05.1995
GR17.05.1995
IT17.05.1995
LI17.05.1995
SE17.08.1995
GB28.09.1995
LU30.09.1995
NL30.09.1995
FR13.10.1995
Former [2000/04]AT17.05.1995
BE17.05.1995
CH17.05.1995
DK17.05.1995
GR17.05.1995
IT17.05.1995
LI17.05.1995
SE17.08.1995
GB28.09.1995
LU30.09.1995
FR13.10.1995
Former [1999/42]AT17.05.1995
BE17.05.1995
CH17.05.1995
DK17.05.1995
IT17.05.1995
LI17.05.1995
SE17.08.1995
GB28.09.1995
FR13.10.1995
Former [1998/15]AT17.05.1995
BE17.05.1995
CH17.05.1995
DK17.05.1995
LI17.05.1995
SE17.08.1995
GB28.09.1995
FR13.10.1995
Former [1996/47]AT17.05.1995
BE17.05.1995
CH17.05.1995
LI17.05.1995
SE17.08.1995
GB28.09.1995
FR13.10.1995
Former [1996/16]AT17.05.1995
BE17.05.1995
CH17.05.1995
LI17.05.1995
SE17.08.1995
FR13.10.1995
Former [1996/04]AT17.05.1995
BE17.05.1995
CH17.05.1995
LI17.05.1995
SE17.08.1995
Former [1996/02]AT17.05.1995
CH17.05.1995
LI17.05.1995
Former [1995/49]CH17.05.1995
LI17.05.1995
Documents cited:Search[A]US4339013  ;
 [A]WO7900647  ;
 [A]US3094713  ;
 [A]GB2125285  ;
 [AD]US4700415  ;
 [A]US2165529  ;
 [A]BE795120  ;
 [A]US4431206  ;
 [A]DE2545999  ;
 [AP]GB2219198
ExaminationBE2545999