blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0422558

EP0422558 - Ceramic substrate used for fabricating electric or electronic circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2006Revocation of patentpublished on 06.12.2006  [2006/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION
6-1, Otemachi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1991/23]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Materials Corporation
6-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1991/16]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Materials Corporation
No. 5-2, Ohtemachi, 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshida, Hideaki, c/o Mitsubishi Metal Corp.
Chu Kenkyujo, 297 Kitabukuro-cho 1-chome
Omiya-shi, Saitama 330 / JP
02 / Kuromitsu, Yoshirou, c/o Mitsubishi Metal Corp.
Chuo Kenkyujo, 297 Kitabukuro-cho 1-chome
Omiya-shi, Saitama 330 / JP
03 / Toriumi, Makoto, c/o Mitsubishi Metal Corp.
Chuo Kenkyujo 297 Kitabukuro-cho 1-chome
Omiya-shi, Saitama 330 / JP
04 / Yuzawa, Michio, c/o Mitsubishi Metal Corp.
Chuo Kenkyujo, 297 Kitabukuro-cho 1-chome
Omiya-shi, Saitama 330 / JP
[1991/16]
Representative(s)Pätzold, Herbert
Pasinger Strasse 6
82166 Gräfelfing / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/16]Pätzold, Herbert, Dr.-Ing.
Steubstrasse 10
D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE
Application number, filing date90119255.908.10.1990
[1991/16]
Priority number, dateJP1989011858809.10.1989         Original published format: JP 11858889
JP1989026371009.10.1989         Original published format: JP 26371089
[1991/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0422558
Date:17.04.1991
Language:EN
[1991/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0422558
Date:18.12.1991
Language:EN
[1991/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0422558
Date:28.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.1991
ClassificationIPC:H01L23/498, H01L21/48, H01L23/373
[1991/51]
CPC:
H05K1/09 (EP,US); H01L29/06 (KR); H01L23/3735 (EP,US);
H01L23/49866 (EP,US); H05K3/38 (EP,US); H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US); H05K3/0061 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1991/16]H01L23/498, H01L23/373
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1991/16]
TitleGerman:Keramisches Substrat angewendet zum Herstellen einer elektrischen oder elektronischen Schaltung[1991/16]
English:Ceramic substrate used for fabricating electric or electronic circuit[1991/16]
French:Substrat céramique utilisé pour la fabrication d'un circuit électrique ou électronique[1991/16]
Examination procedure28.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/16]
17.03.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.09.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.1996Date of oral proceedings
28.05.1996Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
28.05.1996Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.04.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.09.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.11.2000Fee for grant paid
14.11.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination27.07.1996Appeal received No.  T0947/96
30.09.1996Statement of grounds filed
10.03.1999Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [1999/11]
15.07.1999Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1999/29]
07.12.1999Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
07.12.1999Date of oral proceedings
29.12.1999Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP00104669.7   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 04.04.2000
EP00104809.9  / EP1020914
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.12.2001  15.01.2002  ADMISSIBLE
IXYS Semiconductor GmbH
Edisonstrasse 15
68623 Lampertheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L.
Patentanwälte
John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2002/10]
Opponent(s)01  20.12.2001  15.01.2002  ADMISSIBLE
IXYS Semiconductor GmbH
Edisonstrasse 15
68623 Lampertheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
07.02.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.08.2002Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
31.05.2006Date of oral proceedings
31.05.2006Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/49]
20.07.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.07.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 07
30.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 08
02.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 09
02.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 10
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL28.03.2001
[2003/07]
Documents cited:Search[X]JP01214194  ;
 [A]JP01012559  ;
 [AP]JP02094649  ;
 [A]US4409278  (JOCHYM ERIC P [US]);
 [Y]US4700273  (KAUFMAN LANCE R [US])
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 525 (E-850)22 November 1989 & JP-A-01 214 194 ( TOSHIBA CORP. ), & JP01214194 A 19891122
 [Y]  - * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 186 (E-752)2 May 1989 & JP-A-01 012 559 ( TOSHIBA CORP. ), & JP01012559 A 19890502
 [AP]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 292 (E-0944)25 June 1990 & JP-A-02 094 649 ( MITSUBISHI METAL CORP. ), & JP02094649 A 19900625
ExaminationEP0097944
 EP0252519
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.