Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0425871

EP0425871 - Fiber optic telecommunication system employing continuous downlink, burst uplink transmission format with preset uplink guard band [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  21.01.2000
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pliant Systems, Inc.
Research Triangle Park
North Carolina / US
[N/P]
Former [1991/19]For all designated states
BROADBAND TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Research Triangle Park
North Carolina / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sharpe, Randall B.
2016 Price Creek Rd.
Chapel Hill N.C. 27516 / US
02 / Jones, Richard J.
10516 Tree Bark Ct.
Raleigh N.C. 27613 / US
03 / O'Shea, Thomas E.
20 Wysteria Way
Chapel Hill N.C. 27514 / US
04 / Casper, Paul W.
8592 Sylvan Drive
West Melbourne FL 32904 / US
05 / Toy, James W.
2811 S. Cameron Street
Melbourne FL 32901 / US
06 / Evans, Gregory M.
204 Electra Drive
Cary N.C. 27513 / US
07 / Sears, Richard N.
617 Brandywine Circle
Raleigh 27614 / US
[1991/19]
Representative(s)Wilhelm & Dauster
Hospitalstrasse 8
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/19]Wilhelm & Dauster Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys
Hospitalstrasse 8
D-70174 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date90119655.013.10.1990
[1991/19]
Priority number, dateUS1989042908330.10.1989         Original published format: US 429083
[1991/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0425871
Date:08.05.1991
Language:EN
[1991/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0425871
Date:22.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.1992
ClassificationInternational:H04B10/20
[1991/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1991/19]
TitleGerman:Lichtwellenleiter-Übertragungssystem unter Anwendung von kontinuierlichem Abwärts- und Burstaufwärtsformat mit vorgegebenem Aufwärtsschutzband[1991/19]
English:Fiber optic telecommunication system employing continuous downlink, burst uplink transmission format with preset uplink guard band[1991/19]
French:Système de communication par fibres optiques utilisant un format continu pour la liaison descendante et en rafales pour la liaison montante avec bande de protection montante préréglée[1991/19]
Examination procedure25.07.1992Examination requested  [1992/39]
15.11.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.05.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
30.04.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.1997Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2000/10]
15.11.1999Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/10]
Appeal following examination29.01.1998Appeal received No.  T0456/98
17.04.1998Statement of grounds filed
15.11.1999Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
14.09.1999Date of oral proceedings
17.09.1999Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP99121969.2  / EP1009111
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
20.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
22.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 07
20.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 08
12.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 09
19.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:SearchEP0935549  [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]);
 [X]EP0015579  (BORIN F W [US], et al);
 [A]US3482030  (WISNIEWSKI WALTER S);
 [A]US4542437  (ELLIS WILLIAM H [US], et al)
    [ ] - IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, Tokyo, 15th - 18th November 1987, pages 1439-1443, New York, US; N. TOKURA et al.: "A broadband subscriber network using optical star couplers", page 1439, right-hand column, lines 11-17; page 1440, left-hand column, line 12 - right-hand column, line 11; page 1441, right-hand column, line 7 - page 1442, left-hand column, line 24; page 1442, right-hand column, lines 39-43; figures 1,2,6,9; tables 1,2.
    [ ] - NACHRICHTENTECHNISCHE BERICHTE, No. 4, May 1987, pages 92-101, Backnang, DE; L. GOHM et al.: "Auf dem Wege zu einem universellen Kommunikationsnetz", page 98, left-hand column, line 9 - centre column, line 10; figure 6,10.
    [ ] - IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, vol. 26, no. 1, January 1988, pages 34-43, New York, US; M.F. MESIYA: "Implementation of a broadband integrated services hybrid network", page 38, right-hand column, line 1 - page 39, left-hand column, line 38; page 39, left-hand column, line 61 - right-hand column, line 5; page 40, right-hand column, line 8- page 41, right-hand column, line 24; figures 1,3,5.
    [ ] - IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE & EXHIBITION, Hollywood, 28th November - 1st December 1988, pages 1255-1259, New York, US; Y. SAITO et al.: "TDMA telephone service system on a broadband coaxial network", page 1256, left-hand column, line 21 - page 1257, left-hand column, line 5.
    [ ] - NACHRICHTENTECHNISCHE BERICHTE, no. 4, May 1987, pages 74-78, Backnang, DE; W. BONK et al.: "Breitbandkoppelfeld mit monolithisch integrierter (16 x 16)-Koppelmatrix", page 75, left-hand column, line 31 - page 76, centre column, line 13; figures 4,6.
    [ ] - IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, vol. SAC-5, no. 8, October 1987, pages 1242-1248, New York, US; D. BOETTLE et al.: "Technology aspects for system 12 broadband ISDN", page 1245, left-hand column, line 11 - page 1246, left-hand column, line 15.
    [ ] - IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, vol. 25, no. 1, January 1987, pages 69-79, New York, US; D.J. HARROLD et al.: "The broadband universal telecommunications network", page 72, right-hand column, line 46 - page 73, left-hand column, line 27; figure 4.