blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0423720

EP0423720 - Process for producing toner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.01.1997
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.01.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.02.1997 [1997/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Paint Co., Ltd.
2-1-2, Oyodokita Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1991/17]For all designated states
NIPPON PAINT CO., LTD.
2-1-2, Oyodokita Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yabuuchi, Naoya
701, 4-1-1, Nishimakino
Hirakata-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
02 / Maruta, Masayuki
36-5, Kunimatsu-cho
Nayagawa-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
03 / Otsuka, Chikayuki
23-32,Kaminoguchi-cho
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
04 / Kanakura, Akihiro
25-22-405, Shakusonji-cho
Hirakata-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
05 / Kashihara, Akio
3-24-12, Yamanoue
Hirakata-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
[1991/17]
Representative(s)Hansen, Bernd, et al
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20
81904 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/17]Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
D-81904 München / DE
Application number, filing date90119833.316.10.1990
[1991/17]
Priority number, dateJP1989027001916.10.1989         Original published format: JP 27001989
JP1989027002016.10.1989         Original published format: JP 27002089
[1991/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0423720
Date:24.04.1991
Language:EN
[1991/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0423720
Date:28.08.1991
Language:EN
[1991/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0423720
Date:21.02.1996
[1996/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.1991
ClassificationIPC:G03G9/08, G03G9/087
[1991/17]
CPC:
G03G9/08702 (EP,US); G03G9/0806 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1991/17]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Tonern[1991/17]
English:Process for producing toner[1991/17]
French:Procédé de préparation de toneur[1991/17]
Examination procedure23.12.1991Examination requested  [1992/09]
12.08.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.02.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.08.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.1995Fee for grant paid
20.10.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.11.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
30.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP0180434  ;
 [A]JP60230663  ;
 [A]US4789617  (ARAHARA KOZO [JP], et al);
 [A]EP0297839  (BANDO CHEMICAL IND [JP]);
 [A]EP0246814  (CANON KK [JP]);
 [A]US3104068  (PAOLO CASTELLI, et al)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 286 (C-613)() 29 June 1989, & JP-A-01 80434 (NIPPON PAINT CO. LTD.) 27 March 1989,, & JP0180434 A 19890327
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 97 (P-446)(2154) 15 April 1986, & JP-A-60 230663 (KONISHIROKU SHASHIN KOGYO K. K.) 16 November 1985,, & JP60230663 A 19851116
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.