blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0423797

EP0423797 - Driving device for recording head and recording apparatus having said device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.01.1997
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.02.1997 [1997/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1991/17]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawai, Jun, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
770, Shimonoge, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Ikeda, Ikumasa, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
770, Shimonoge, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
03 / Takiguchi, Hideo, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
770, Shimonoge, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1991/17]
Representative(s)Grupe, Peter, et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne-Grupe-Pellmann-Grams-Struif Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/17]Grupe, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne-Grupe-Pellmann-Grams-Struif Bavariaring 4
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date90120016.218.10.1990
[1991/17]
Priority number, dateJP1989027037019.10.1989         Original published format: JP 27037089
JP1989028743606.11.1989         Original published format: JP 28743689
JP1989028743806.11.1989         Original published format: JP 28743889
JP1990002220302.02.1990         Original published format: JP 2220390
[1991/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0423797
Date:24.04.1991
Language:EN
[1991/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0423797
Date:06.11.1991
Language:EN
[1991/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0423797
Date:06.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.1991
ClassificationIPC:B41J2/355, B41J2/515
[1996/10]
CPC:
B41J2/3551 (EP,US); B41J2/515 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1991/17]B41J2/515
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1991/17]
TitleGerman:Steuervorrichtung für Aufzeichnungskopf und damit versehenes Aufzeichnungsgerät[1991/17]
English:Driving device for recording head and recording apparatus having said device[1991/17]
French:Dispositif pour la commande d'une tête d'enregistrement et appareil d'enregistrement comportant ce dispositif[1991/17]
Examination procedure21.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/17]
16.07.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.01.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
12.04.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.08.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.04.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.1995Fee for grant paid
03.07.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.12.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1997/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4738553  (UEMURA HISASHI [JP], et al);
 [A]EP0142964  (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]);
 [A]US4353079  (KAWANABE TSUYOSHI);
 [A]US4536771  (TANAKA HIDESHI [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.