Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0434926

EP0434926 - A programmable thermostat with a temperature display [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  13.02.2004
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
B.P.T. S.p.A.
Via Roma, 41
I-30020 Cinto Caomaggiore (Venezia) / IT
[1991/27]
Inventor(s)01 / Simonin, Dino
Via delle Industrie, 8
I-33075 Morsano al Tagliamento / IT
[1991/27]
Representative(s)Cantaluppi, Stefano , et al
Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l.
Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18
35122 Padova / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/09]Cantaluppi, Stefano , et al
Cantaluppi & Partners, Via Matteotti,26
35137 Padova / IT
Former [1991/27]Perani, Aurelio , et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Berchet, 9
I-35131 Padova / IT
Application number, filing date90120680.529.10.1990
[1991/27]
Priority number, dateIT19890030788U29.12.1989         Original published format: IT 3078889 U
[1991/27]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0434926
Date:03.07.1991
Language:EN
[1991/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0434926
Date:22.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0434926
Date:23.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.1992
ClassificationInternational:G05D23/19
[1991/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [1991/27]
TitleGerman:Programmierbarer Thermostat mit Temperatuanzeige[1991/27]
English:A programmable thermostat with a temperature display[1991/27]
French:Thermostat programmable avec affichage de température[1991/27]
Examination procedure17.09.1992Examination requested  [1992/47]
16.12.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.04.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
27.01.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
03.02.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.04.1995Fee for grant paid
22.04.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.05.1996  29.05.1996  ADMISSIBLE
VEMER S.P.A
via Belvedere,11
20047 BRUGHERIO (MILANO) / IT
Opponent's representative
Modiano, Guido
Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
 02  23.05.1996  10.06.1996  ADMISSIBLE
PERRY ELECTRIC S.r.l.
Via Milanese 11
VENIANO (Como) / IT
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2001/20]
Opponent(s)01  15.05.1996  29.05.1996  ADMISSIBLE
VEMER S.P.A
via Belvedere,11
20047 BRUGHERIO (MILANO) / IT
Opponent's representative
Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing.
Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
 02  23.05.1996  10.06.1996  ADMISSIBLE
PERRY ELECTRIC S.r.l.
Via Milanese 11
VENIANO (Como) / IT
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
Former [1996/31]
Opponent(s)01  15.05.1996  29.05.1996  ADMISSIBLE
VEMER S.P.A
via Belvedere,11
20047 BRUGHERIO (MILANO) / IT
Opponent's representative
Reniero, Cirillo Silvano
Modiano & Associati SpA Corso Porta Nuova, 109
37122 Verona / IT
 02  23.05.1996  10.06.1996  ADMISSIBLE
PERRY ELECTRIC S.r.l.
Via Milanese 11
VENIANO (Como) / IT
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
Former [1996/29]
Opponent(s)01  15.05.1996  29.05.1996  ADMISSIBLE
VEMER S.P.A
via Belvedere,11
20047 BRUGHERIO (MILANO) / IT
Opponent's representative
Reniero, Cirillo Silvano
Modiano & Associati SpA Corso Porta Nuova, 109
37122 Verona / IT
05.07.1996Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.01.1997Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.1998Reply to a communication from the opposition division
17.11.2000Date of oral proceedings
13.12.2000Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.12.2000Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
09.02.2004Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2004/14]
Appeal following opposition28.02.2001Appeal received No.  T0314/01
20.04.2001Statement of grounds filed
08.01.2002Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2002/02]
07.03.2002Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2002/10]
18.12.2003Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent deemed not to be filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
14.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.08.1995
BE23.08.1995
DK23.08.1995
ES23.08.1995
NL23.08.1995
CH31.10.1996
LI31.10.1996
[2003/11]
Former [2002/45]AT23.08.1995
BE23.08.1995
DK23.08.1995
ES23.08.1995
NL31.10.1995
CH31.10.1996
LI31.10.1996
Former [2002/24]AT23.08.1995
BE23.08.1995
CH23.08.1995
DK23.08.1995
ES23.08.1995
LI23.08.1995
NL31.10.1995
Former [2000/52]AT23.08.1995
BE23.08.1995
CH23.08.1995
DK23.08.1995
LI23.08.1995
NL31.10.1995
Former [2000/50]AT23.08.1995
BE23.08.1995
DK23.08.1995
CH24.10.1995
LI24.10.1995
NL31.10.1995
Former [2000/27]AT23.08.1995
BE23.08.1995
DK23.08.1995
NL31.10.1995
Former [1998/15]AT23.08.1995
BE23.08.1995
DK23.08.1995
Former [1996/22]AT23.08.1995
BE23.08.1995
Former [1996/14]AT23.08.1995
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE2946948  ;
 [Y]DE3438196  ;
 [Y]US4213562  ;
 [A]US4298163  ;
 [A]FR2496925