Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0434926 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0434926



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 446
10.02.2004 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
30.01.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.01.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.01.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.01.2004 Refund of fees Appeal 1
18.12.2003 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 7
14.03.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.03.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.03.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
14.01.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
07.01.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.01.2002 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 2
16.06.2001 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.04.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.04.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.04.2001 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
19.04.2001 Decision rejecting the opposition Appeal 1
19.04.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
29.03.2001 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.03.2001 F3019 Communication of loss of rights: non-payment of the appeal fee Appeal 1
29.03.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.03.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.03.2001 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.03.2001 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.03.2001 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
28.02.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
30.01.2001 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
30.01.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.01.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.01.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.12.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
15.12.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
15.12.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.12.2000 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 3
13.12.2000 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 18
13.12.2000 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.11.2000 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
17.11.2000 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
19.04.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
11.04.2000 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.03.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.03.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.03.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.03.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.03.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.03.2000 Annex to the communication Opposition 13
14.03.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
14.03.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
14.03.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
11.02.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 3
09.02.2000 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.11.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
17.11.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.11.1998 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
17.11.1998 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 5
19.10.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
08.10.1998 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 11
08.07.1998 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
11.09.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
02.09.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.08.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.08.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.07.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.07.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
15.05.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.05.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.03.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
12.02.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
12.02.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.02.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.02.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
12.02.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
12.02.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
20.01.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
11.01.1997 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
03.01.1997 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
22.11.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
22.11.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
14.11.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
05.07.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
05.07.1996 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
05.07.1996 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.06.1996 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
17.06.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.06.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
30.05.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
23.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.05.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
23.05.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
15.05.1996 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
15.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.05.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
15.05.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
15.05.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
05.10.1995 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
12.09.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
05.09.1995 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
13.07.1995 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
16.05.1995 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
16.05.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
09.05.1995 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.05.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
02.05.1995 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.05.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
02.05.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
03.02.1995 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
24.01.1995 Claims Search / examination 1
24.01.1995 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
04.11.1994 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
04.11.1994 Text intended for grant Search / examination 9
13.10.1994 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
10.08.1994 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
26.04.1994 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.04.1994 Claims Search / examination 1
21.04.1994 Description Search / examination 3
21.04.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
16.12.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
04.03.1991 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.03.1991 European search report Search / examination 2
22.02.1991 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.02.1991 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
29.10.1990 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.10.1990 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
29.10.1990 Claims Search / examination 1
29.10.1990 Description Search / examination 6
29.10.1990 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.10.1990 Drawings Search / examination 1
29.10.1990 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
29.10.1990 Priority document Search / examination 13
29.10.1990 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
29.10.1990 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 10
29.10.1990 Translation of priority document Search / examination 11