Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0431487

EP0431487 - Process for preparing 3,4'-dichlorodiphenyl-ether [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.08.1995
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.08.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.10.1995 [1995/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/24]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Papenfuhs, Theodor, Dr.
Heinrich-Bleicher-Strasse 40
W-6000 Frankfurt am Main / DE
02 / Schubert, Hans, Dr.
Hölderlinstrasse 56
W-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE
03 / Hess, Reiner, Dr.
Lärchenstrasse 4
W-6200 Wiesbaden / DE
[1991/24]
Application number, filing date90122931.030.11.1990
[1991/24]
Priority number, dateDE1989394013005.12.1989         Original published format: DE 3940130
[1991/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0431487
Date:12.06.1991
Language:DE
[1991/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0431487
Date:26.10.1994
Language:DE
[1994/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.1991
ClassificationInternational:C07C43/29, C07C43/16
[1991/24]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1991/24]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von 3,4'-Dichlor-diphenylether[1991/24]
English:Process for preparing 3,4'-dichlorodiphenyl-ether[1991/24]
French:Procédé de préparation de 3,4'-dichloro-diphényl-éther[1991/24]
Examination procedure21.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/24]
05.05.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.01.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.04.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.1994Fee for grant paid
04.07.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.07.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]JP62281837  ;
 [A]JP6341434  ;
 [AD]US4766253
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 109, Nr. 9, 29. August 1988, Seite 658, Zusammenfassung Nr. 73126z, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-62 281 837 (TEIJIN PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD) 07-12-1987, & JP62281837 A 00000000
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 110, Nr. 17, 24. April 1989, Seite 684, Zusammenfassung Nr. 153894j, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-63 41 434 (TEIJIN PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD) 22-02-1988, & JP6341434 A 00000000
ExaminationJP62281837
 JP6341434
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 109, Nr. 9, 29. August 1988, Seite 658, Zusammenfassung Nr. 73126z, Columbus, Ohio, US; H. OSHINO et al, "Process for preparation of 3,4'-dichlorodiphenyl ether as an intermediate for agrochemicals, pharmaceuticals, and polymers"; & JP-A-62 281 837, & JP62281837 A 00000000
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 110, Nr. 17, 24. April 1989, Seite 684, Zusammenfassung Nr. 153894j, Columbus, Ohio, US; H. OSHINO et al, "Process for the preparation of 3,4'-dichlorodiphenyl ether as intermediate for 3,4'-diaminodiphenyl ether"; & JP-A-63 41 434, & JP6341434 A 00000000