Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0444262 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0444262



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 398
22.09.2004 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.09.2004 Refund of fees Opposition 1
01.09.2004 Refund of fees Opposition 1
01.09.2004 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
26.08.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
26.08.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.08.2004 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
11.08.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 3
11.08.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
31.07.2004 Claims Opposition 2
31.07.2004 Claims Opposition 2
31.07.2004 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
31.07.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
11.06.2004 Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit Opposition 1
07.04.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.04.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.01.2004 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
27.01.2004 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
27.01.2004 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
08.01.2004 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
07.01.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.01.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
14.10.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
14.10.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
07.10.2003 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 19
07.10.2003 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
19.09.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.09.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
05.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
05.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.08.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.08.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.08.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.05.2003 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.04.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.04.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.04.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
11.04.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
11.04.2003 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
04.05.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.04.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
18.04.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
18.04.2001 Request for assignment Appeal 2
05.10.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.09.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
28.07.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
28.07.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
24.07.2000 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
16.03.2000 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.03.2000 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.03.2000 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
03.03.2000 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
02.03.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.03.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
01.03.2000 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
15.02.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.02.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
15.02.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.02.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.12.1999 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
23.11.1999 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Opposition 1
05.11.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.10.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.10.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.10.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.10.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 9
26.10.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
26.10.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
26.10.1999 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
26.10.1999 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 10
26.10.1999 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
26.10.1999 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.09.1999 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
06.09.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.09.1999 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Opposition 2
01.09.1999 Request for assignment Opposition 1
28.08.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
28.08.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.08.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
27.08.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.08.1999 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.08.1999 Claims Opposition 2
26.08.1999 Claims Opposition 2
26.08.1999 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 8
26.08.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
26.08.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 12
26.08.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
12.08.1999 Request for change of name of the applicant Opposition 2
21.01.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.01.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.01.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.01.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.01.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
12.01.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
12.01.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
17.12.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.12.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.12.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.12.1998 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.04.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.03.1998 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.03.1998 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.03.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.03.1998 Claims Opposition 2
17.03.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.03.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.03.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
17.03.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
17.03.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.03.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.03.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.03.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.03.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.03.1998 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
17.03.1998 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 5
28.11.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
28.11.1997 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
03.07.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.06.1997 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 3
16.05.1997 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
07.05.1997 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
10.01.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
10.01.1997 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
05.12.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
27.11.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.11.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.11.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.11.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.11.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.11.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
22.11.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
18.01.1996 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
27.09.1995 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.09.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
27.09.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
30.08.1995 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 13
17.08.1995 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.07.1995 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
14.07.1995 Text intended for grant Search / examination 15
09.06.1995 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
03.06.1995 Claims Search / examination 2
03.06.1995 Description Search / examination 2
03.06.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
03.06.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
03.06.1995 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
16.02.1995 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
12.02.1992 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
02.12.1991 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.12.1991 European search report Search / examination 2
11.12.1990 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.12.1990 Claims Search / examination 2
11.12.1990 Description Search / examination 12
11.12.1990 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.12.1990 Priority document Search / examination 16
11.12.1990 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5