Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0466978

EP0466978 - Process and apparatus for coating pistons [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.05.1996
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alt, Peter Dipl-Ing.
Rindelbacher-Strasse 38
D-73479 Ellwangen / DE
[1992/04]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1992/04]
Representative(s)Lorenz, Werner
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Strasse 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/04]Lorenz, Werner, Dipl.-Ing.
Fasanenstrasse 7
D-89522 Heidenheim / DE
Application number, filing date90124892.220.12.1990
[1992/04]
Priority number, dateDE1990402313520.07.1990         Original published format: DE 4023135
[1992/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0466978
Date:22.01.1992
Language:DE
[1992/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0466978
Date:28.12.1994
Language:DE
[1994/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.1994
ClassificationInternational:B05D5/08, B41M1/12, F02F3/10, B41M1/40, B41F15/08
[1994/52]
Former International [1992/04]B05D5/08, B41M1/12, F02F3/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1992/04]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Beschichten von Motorkolben[1992/04]
English:Process and apparatus for coating pistons[1992/04]
French:Procédé et appareil pour revêtir des pistons[1992/04]
Examination procedure30.01.1995Examination requested  [1995/13]
04.09.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.1996Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1996/28]
14.02.1996Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1996/28]
Appeal following examination16.09.1991Appeal received No.  J0014/91
16.09.1991Statement of grounds filed
06.11.1991Result of appeal procedure: allowance of appeal
06.11.1991Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
15.12.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.199506   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]LU54833  (VERRERIES MECANIQUES CHAMPENOISES) [X] 14,16 * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]GB984204  (W.R. FOSTER LTD.) [X] 14,16 * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]FR2210936  (L.DUBUIT) [X] 14,16 * page 3, line 30 - page 7, line 11; figure - *;
 [X]US2209688  (R.S. DAVIS) [X] 14,16 * figure - *;
 [X]FR2166999  (PRODU A.G.) [X] 14,16 * figure -; claim - *