Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0440966 | ![]() | 30.11.1994 | B1 | EP0440966 | 14.08.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4004014 | 09.02.1990 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE114456T | 15.12.1994 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE4004014 | 09.02.1990 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2034692 | 10.08.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4004014 | 09.02.1990 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4004014 | 26.10.1995 | C2 | DE4004014 | 11.04.1991 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE4004014 | 09.02.1990 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0440966T | 23.01.1995 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4004014 | 09.02.1990 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2023633T | 16.01.1995 | T3 | ES2023633 | 01.02.1992 | A4 | Priority number | Date | DE4004014 | 09.02.1990 |