blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0440966

EP0440966 - Skin disinfectant composition and process for the production [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.09.1995
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Felsch, Horst, Dr. Dipl.-Ing.
Schlossberg 25
A-6391 Fieberbrunn / AT
[1991/33]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1991/33]
Representative(s)Leinweber & Zimmermann
Patentanwalts-PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Viktualienmarkt 8
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Leinweber & Zimmermann
European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
Former [1991/33]Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann
Rosental 7/II Aufg.
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date90125136.321.12.1990
[1991/33]
Priority number, dateDE1990400401409.02.1990         Original published format: DE 4004014
[1991/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0440966
Date:14.08.1991
Language:DE
[1991/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0440966
Date:30.11.1994
Language:DE
[1994/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.1991
ClassificationIPC:A61K7/48, A61K7/40
[1991/33]
CPC:
A61Q17/005 (EP); A01N31/02 (EP); A61K8/585 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP); C07F7/21 (EP); A61K2800/52 (EP)
C-Set:
A01N31/02, A01N2300/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1991/33]
TitleGerman:Mittel zur Desinfektion der Haut und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[1991/33]
English:Skin disinfectant composition and process for the production[1991/33]
French:Composition désinfectante pour la peau et procédé de préparation[1991/33]
Examination procedure18.12.1991Examination requested  [1992/09]
15.12.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
22.02.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
27.05.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
03.06.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.1994Fee for grant paid
01.09.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.08.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
01.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]SU387715  ;
 [A]GB2155337  (RITZ GROUP LTD CHARLES);
 [A]DE3422496  (FRESENIUS AG [DE])
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 80, Nr. 24, 17. Juni 1974, Seite 259, Zusammenfassung Nr. 137174f, Columbus, Ohio, US; & SU-A-387 715 (V.V. CORBUNOVA et al.) 22-06-1973, & SU387715 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.