Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0380189

EP0380189 - Method and apparatus for performing an automated collect call [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  22.11.1996
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INTELLICALL, INC.
2155 Chenault, Suite 410
Carrollton, TX 75006-5023 / US
[1995/26]
Former [1993/52]For all designated states
FIRST INTERSTATE BANK OF TEXAS, N.A.
1445 Ross Avenue
Dallas, Texas 75202 / US
Former [1990/31]For all designated states
INTELLICALL, INC.
2155 Chenault, Suite 410
Carrollton, TX 75006-5023 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hird, John A.
5200 Keller Springs, 917
Dallas, TX 75248 / US
02 / Owen, Lindsey, D.
1709 St. James
Carrollton, TX 75007 / US
03 / Rice, Michael R.
2020 Arles
Carrollton, TX 75007 / US
 [2007/32]
Former [1994/04]01 / Hird, John A.
5200 Keller Springs, #917
Dallas, TX 75248 / US
02 / Owen, Lindsey, D.
1709 St. James
Carrollton, TX 75007 / US
03 / Rice, Michael R.
2020 Arles
Carrollton, TX 75007 / US
Former [1990/31]01 / Hird, John A.
16331 Shady Bank
Dallas, TX 75248 / US
02 / Owen, Lindsey, D.
1709 St. James
Carrollton, TX 75007 / US
03 / Rice, Michael R.
2020 Arles
Carrollton, TX 75007 / US
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/31]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
D-22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date90250014.919.01.1990
[1990/31]
Priority number, dateUS1989030135723.01.1989         Original published format: US 301357
[1990/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0380189
Date:01.08.1990
Language:EN
[1990/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0380189
Date:28.10.1992
Language:EN
[1992/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.1992
ClassificationInternational:H04Q3/00, H04M17/00, H04M3/42
[1992/44]
Former International [1990/31]H04M17/00, H04Q3/00, H04M3/42
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1990/31]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Gerät zur Durchführung von automatischen Kollekte-Anrufen[1990/31]
English:Method and apparatus for performing an automated collect call[1990/31]
French:Méthode et appareil pour réaliser un appel automatique de collecte[1990/31]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure26.02.1993Examination requested  [1993/17]
09.01.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.07.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
14.08.1996Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/02]
24.08.1996Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.199607   M06   Not yet paid
Licence(s)deleted
[1995/30]
Former [1994/02]ID:01 00/not-exclusive
For:all designated states
Licencee:INTELLICAL, INC.
2155 Chenault Suite 410
Carrollton Texas 75006-5023 / US
Date:
[1995/30]
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0185365  ;
 [A]US4054756  ;
 [A]US4777647