Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0379333

EP0379333 - Secure data interchange system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.05.1996
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Graves, Marcel Albert
14008-80 Avenue Edmonton
Alberta T4R 3J7 / US
[N/P]
Former [1990/30]For all designated states
Graves, Marcel Albert
14008-80 Avenue
Edmonton Alberta T4R 3J7 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1990/30]
Representative(s)Howick, Nicholas Keith , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/30]Howick, Nicholas Keith , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date90300442.216.01.1990
[1990/30]
Priority number, dateCA1989058838817.01.1989         Original published format: CA 588388
[1990/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0379333
Date:25.07.1990
Language:EN
[1990/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0379333
Date:12.07.1995
Language:EN
[1995/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.1990
ClassificationInternational:G07F7/10, G07F7/08
[1990/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1990/30]
TitleGerman:System zum sicheren Datenaustausch[1990/30]
English:Secure data interchange system[1990/30]
French:Système de sécurité pour transmission de données[1990/30]
Examination procedure28.05.1990New documents discovered [1990/30]
06.09.1990Examination requested  [1990/44]
28.10.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.04.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.01.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.01.1995Fee for grant paid
30.01.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.04.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
10.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.199203   M06   Fee paid on   24.06.1992
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.07.1995
BE12.07.1995
CH12.07.1995
DK12.07.1995
ES12.07.1995
FR12.07.1995
GR12.07.1995
IT12.07.1995
LI12.07.1995
NL12.07.1995
SE12.10.1995
DE13.10.1995
GB16.01.1996
LU31.01.1996
[2006/14]
Former [2003/07]AT12.07.1995
BE12.07.1995
CH12.07.1995
DK12.07.1995
ES12.07.1995
GR12.07.1995
IT12.07.1995
LI12.07.1995
NL12.07.1995
SE12.10.1995
DE13.10.1995
FR08.12.1995
GB16.01.1996
LU31.01.1996
Former [2002/24]AT12.07.1995
BE12.07.1995
CH12.07.1995
DK12.07.1995
ES12.07.1995
GR12.07.1995
IT12.07.1995
LI12.07.1995
SE12.10.1995
DE13.10.1995
FR08.12.1995
GB16.01.1996
LU31.01.1996
Former [2000/04]AT12.07.1995
BE12.07.1995
CH12.07.1995
DK12.07.1995
GR12.07.1995
IT12.07.1995
LI12.07.1995
SE12.10.1995
DE13.10.1995
FR08.12.1995
GB16.01.1996
LU31.01.1996
Former [1999/42]AT12.07.1995
BE12.07.1995
CH12.07.1995
DK12.07.1995
IT12.07.1995
LI12.07.1995
SE12.10.1995
DE13.10.1995
FR08.12.1995
GB16.01.1996
Former [1998/15]AT12.07.1995
BE12.07.1995
CH12.07.1995
DK12.07.1995
LI12.07.1995
SE12.10.1995
DE13.10.1995
FR08.12.1995
GB16.01.1996
Former [1997/14]AT12.07.1995
BE12.07.1995
CH12.07.1995
LI12.07.1995
SE12.10.1995
DE13.10.1995
FR08.12.1995
GB16.01.1996
Former [1996/22]AT12.07.1995
BE12.07.1995
CH12.07.1995
LI12.07.1995
SE12.10.1995
DE13.10.1995
FR08.12.1995
Former [1996/19]AT12.07.1995
CH12.07.1995
LI12.07.1995
SE12.10.1995
DE13.10.1995
FR08.12.1995
Former [1996/18]AT12.07.1995
CH12.07.1995
LI12.07.1995
SE12.10.1995
DE13.10.1995
Former [1996/14]AT12.07.1995
SE12.10.1995
DE13.10.1995
Former [1996/11]SE12.10.1995
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2181582  (BLACKWELL VICTOR CAMPBELL);
 [A]US4138058  (ATALLA MARTIN M);
 [A]EP0223122  (IBM [US]);
 [A]EP0216298  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]);
 [A]EP0243873  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]);
 [A]EP0220703  ;
 [AD]CA1207460  (CII HONEYWELL BULL);
 [AD]GB2185937  (SHEA MICHAEL ANTHONY O, et al);
 [AD]GB1504196  (INNOVATION STE INT [FR]);
 [AD]GB1505715  (INNOVATION STE INT [FR]);
 [AD]US3702464  (CASTRUCCI PAUL P)