blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0383556

EP0383556 - Cutting method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.06.1995
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.08.1995 [1995/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Horii, Kiyoshi
No. 8-15-501 Kamimeguro 5-Chome Meguro-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
E C CHEMICAL IND. Co., Ltd.
3-28-2-chome, Kasuganishimachi
Hirakata, Osaka / JP
[1990/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Horii, Kiyoshi
5-8-15-501, Kamimeguro
Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1990/34]
Representative(s)Davies, Christopher Robert, et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/34]Davies, Christopher Robert, et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UZ / GB
Application number, filing date90301539.414.02.1990
[1990/34]
Priority number, dateJP1989003449214.02.1989         Original published format: JP 3449289
[1990/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0383556
Date:22.08.1990
Language:EN
[1990/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0383556
Date:10.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.05.1990
ClassificationIPC:B24C5/04
[1990/34]
CPC:
B24C5/04 (EP); B24C1/045 (EP); B26F3/004 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1990/34]
TitleGerman:Schneidverfahren und Vorrichtung[1990/34]
English:Cutting method and apparatus[1990/34]
French:Méthode pour couper et appareil[1990/34]
Examination procedure01.10.1990Examination requested  [1990/48]
29.01.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.07.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.04.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.02.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.05.1994Fee for grant paid
11.05.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.05.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inExaminationSU1245349
    - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, P,Q, sections, week 8710, April 22, 1987 DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD. London P 42 *SU-1245-349 (WLADIMIR POLY)* & SU-A-1245349 (POLY)., & SU1245349 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.