blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0384665

EP0384665 - Optical recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.08.1999
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON PAPER INDUSTRIES CO., LTD.
4-1, Oji 1-chome Kita-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/28]For all designated states
NIPPON PAPER INDUSTRIES CO., LTD.
4-1, Oji 1-chome
Kita-ku, Tokyo / JP
Former [1990/35]For all designated states
JUJO PAPER CO., LTD.
No. 4-1, Oji 1-chome
Kita-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Satake, Toshimi, c/o C. R. Lab. Jujo Paper Co.Ltd.
21-1, Oji 5-chome
Kita-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Nagai, Tomoaki, c/o C. R. Lab. Jujo Paper Co.Ltd.
21-1, Oji 5-chome
Kita-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Fukui, Hiroshi, c/o C. R. Lab. Jujo Paper Co.Ltd.
21-1, Oji 5-chome
Kita-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Yokoyama, Miyuki, c/o C. R. Lab. Jujo Paper Co.Ltd
21-1, Oji 5-chome
Kita-ku, Tokyo / JP
05 / Sekine, Akio, c/o C. R. Lab. Jujo Paper Co.Ltd
21-1, Oji 5-chome
Kita-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1990/35]
Representative(s)West, Alan Harry, et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/35]West, Alan Harry, et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date90301702.816.02.1990
[1990/35]
Priority number, dateJP1989003982920.02.1989         Original published format: JP 3982989
[1990/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0384665
Date:29.08.1990
Language:EN
[1990/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0384665
Date:06.02.1991
Language:EN
[1991/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0384665
Date:14.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.1990
ClassificationIPC:B41M5/40, B41M5/30, B41M5/26, G11B7/24
[1991/13]
CPC:
B41M5/3375 (EP,US); B41M5/465 (EP,US); G11B7/244 (EP,US);
B41M5/323 (EP,US); B41M5/333 (EP,US); Y10S430/145 (EP,US);
Y10S430/146 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1990/35]B41M5/40, B41M5/30, G11B7/24, B41M5/26
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1990/35]
TitleGerman:Optisches Aufzeichnungsmaterial[1990/35]
English:Optical recording medium[1990/35]
French:Matériau d'enregistrement optique[1990/35]
Examination procedure30.07.1991Examination requested  [1991/39]
30.03.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.12.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.04.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.1998Fee for grant paid
22.07.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.07.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/40]
Request for further processing for:30.12.1996Request for further processing filed
30.12.1996Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.02.1997Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
08.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
10.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
08.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 07
10.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 08
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Former [1999/30]DE15.01.1999
Documents cited:Search[YD]JP58094494  ;
 [A]JP56123895  ;
 [A]JP57014096  ;
 [Y]GB2112160  (KANZAKI PAPER MFG CO LTD);
 [Y]GB2198855  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD);
 [A]GB2200220  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD)
 [YD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 193 (M-238)(1338) 24 August 1983, & JP-A-58 094 494 (NIPPON DENSHI DENWA KOSHA) 04 June 1983,, & JP58094494 A 19830604
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 1 (M-105)(879) 07 January 1982, & JP-A-56 123 895 (RICOH K.K.) 09 September 1981,, & JP56123895 A 19810909
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 74 (M-127)(952) 11 May 1982, & JP-A-57 014 096 (PENTEL K.K.) 25 January 1982,, & JP57014096 A 19820125
by applicantGB2112160
 JPS58209594
 JPS5894494
 JPS62187082
 JPS63272702
    - "Near Infrared Absorption Dyestuffs", CHEMICAL INDUSTRY, (198605), vol. 43
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.